Naderi v. Sophos Inc.

Plaintiff: Greg F. Naderi
Defendant: Sophos Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv04006
Filed: September 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 20 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
June 16, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 29 Stipulation re: Dismissal with Prejudice of Courth Cause of Action filed by Sophos Inc.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/16/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 14, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication filed by Sophos Inc. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/14/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
October 13, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE SCHEDULING ORDER re 11 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 13, 2015 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naderi v. Sophos Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg F. Naderi
Represented By: Richard Neil Koss
Represented By: Randy L. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sophos Inc.
Represented By: Tyler A. Brown
Represented By: Danielle Yvette McMillian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?