Matera v. Google Inc.

Plaintiff: Daniel Matera
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv04062
Filed: September 4, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Google's motion to dismiss based on lack of standing. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/23/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
August 12, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion to Dismiss as to the Merits of Plaintiff's Claims. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/12/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
May 25, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/25/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
April 28, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/28/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
February 5, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 21 Motion to Stay (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matera v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Whitty Somvichian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Matera
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Nicole Diane Sugnet
Represented By: Dominic R Valerian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?