Richard Pohly v. Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Pohly
Defendant: Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv04113
Filed: September 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 120 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SCHEDULING RE 116 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/26/2017. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 96 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 46 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to File Under Seal; granting 52 Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion to File Under Seal. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/6/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 39 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Thomas E. Fox. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 35 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Dates. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER SETTING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2016. Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/7/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CASE SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 22, 2015, re 25 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying Motion to Related Cases ( re 15-300 RMW and 15-4113 PSG ) signed by Judge Ronald M Whyte on 12/17/2015. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER extending deadline for Plaintiff Pohly to respond to Defendant Intuitive Surgical, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to consider whether cases should be related (Case:15cv00300RMW). Response due 12/15/2015. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/23/2015. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASES (84 in case 3:13-cv-04863-JST). Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 16, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Pohly v. Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Pohly
Represented By: Richard Henry Friedman
Represented By: Peter J Mullenix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?