Gardner v. Hewlett-Packard Company

Plaintiff: Martha Gardner
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Case Number: 5:2015cv04190
Filed: September 14, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:626
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 35 Stipulation of Dismissal. The Clerk shall close the file. Deadline/Hearing dates are terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/2/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
June 24, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/25/2016 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 8/18/2016. All other pretrial deadlines and hearing dates are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/24/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
January 27, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint filed by Martha Gardner. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/27/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Hewlett-Packard Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Represented By: Angela Melody Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Gardner
Represented By: Alan Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?