Rosalio Alvarez v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Plaintiff: Rosalio Alvarez
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 5:2015cv04204
Filed: September 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING 29 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/28/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 17 DEFENDANT NATIONSTAR'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/29/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/16/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/30/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER That Case Be Reassigned to a District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/6/2015. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Referring Case to ADR Unit for Assessment Telephone Conference. Conference to take place by 10/30/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/16/2015. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosalio Alvarez v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalio Alvarez
Represented By: Nikhil Bhatnagar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Gruber
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?