Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.130.53.150

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.130.53.150
Case Number: 5:2015cv04243
Filed: September 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 41 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
May 19, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 7/5/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 5/19/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016) Modified on 5/19/2016 (mklS, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SEALING MOTION by Hon. William Alsup granting 29 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
February 26, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILEUNDER SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 24 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
February 5, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS by Hon. William Alsup granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
January 26, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SEALING MOTION AND EXTENDING DEADLINE TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 17 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 17, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO SERVE DEFENDANT WITH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2016)
November 25, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/25/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
October 18, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup granting 8 Ex Parte Application.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.130.53.150
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Brenna Elsie Erlbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.130.53.150
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?