Blackbird Tecnhologies, Inc. v. Joshi

Plaintiff: Blackbird Tecnhologies, Inc.
Defendant: Prateek Joshi
Case Number: 5:2015cv04272
Filed: September 18, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/6/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
September 30, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED Temporary Restraining Order. This amended order replaces the temporary restraining order issued on 9/22/2015 15 . Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/30/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 25, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER re 22 MOTION to Vacate TRO filed by Prateek Joshi. Plaintiff shall file and serve an opposition, if any, on or before 4:00 p.m. on 9/28/2015. No reply will be considered and one should not be filed. The matter wi ll be deemed submitted upon the filing of the opposition or upon the close of business on 9/28/2015, whichever occurs first, and a decision will issue based on the papers unless the court orders otherwise. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/25/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 24, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER. As to Plaintiff's anticipated motion to remand, the court orders as follows: 1. Plaintiff shall file and serve the motion on or before October 9, 2015. 2. Defendant shall file and serve an opposition, if any, on or before October 23, 2015. 3. Any reply to the opposition shall be filed and served on or before October 30, 2015. 4. The court schedules a hearing on the motion for 9:00 a.m. on November 19, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/24/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackbird Tecnhologies, Inc. v. Joshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blackbird Tecnhologies, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Robert Brausa
Represented By: Joshua H. Lerner
Represented By: Timothy Chen Saulsbury
Represented By: Ragesh K. Tangri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prateek Joshi
Represented By: Jack Russo
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Sargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?