People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals et al v. Whole Foods Market Inc. et al

Plaintiff: People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals and Leah Williams
Defendant: Whole Foods Market Inc., Whole Foods Market California, Inc. and Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv04301
Filed: September 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE. Re: Dkt. No. 52 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
January 29, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Re: Dkt. No. 32 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
December 3, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Re: Dkt. No. 24 . Court GRANTS leave to file the second amended complaint. The Court also GRANTS the briefing schedule proposed by the parties. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/3/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
December 1, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT THE OPPORTUNITY TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Re: Dkt. No. 22 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on December 1, 2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
November 30, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. PETA is ordered to show cause by 12/4/2015, why the Court should accept its second amended complaint. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/30/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
October 15, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AS MODIFIED GRANTING STIPULATION SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE 10 . Defendants to file consent or declination by 11/14/2015. Case Management Statement due by 12/18/2015. Hearing on Rule 12 Motion and Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2016 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/15/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals et al v. Whole Foods Market Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Elaine T. Byszewski
Represented By: Christopher Robert Pitoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Williams
Represented By: Elaine T. Byszewski
Represented By: Christopher Robert Pitoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Foods Market Inc.
Represented By: Brian R. Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Foods Market California, Inc.
Represented By: Brian R. Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Brian R. Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?