Ingram v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mary Ingram
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Seventh Ave., Ally Financial, Inc., Ashro, Inc., Golden 1 Credit Union and Patient Accounting Service Center, LLC
Case Number: 5:2015cv04327
Filed: September 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The hearing on the Order to Show Cause scheduled for 8/4/2016 is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on 9/1/2016. On or before 8/25/2016, the parties shall file an updated joint statement. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/29/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
June 8, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. The parties are ordered to appear on 8/4/2016 at 10:00 AM to show cause why the case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). On or before 7/28/2016, the parties shall file a j oint statement in response to the Order to Show Cause setting forth the status of settlement efforts as well as the amount of additional time necessary to finalize and file a dismissal. All other pretrial deadlines and hearing dates are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/8/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
April 29, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment as to the The Golden 1 Credit Union on or before May 30, 2016, unless a stipulation to set aside the default is filed before that time. T he court schedules a hearing on the anticipated motion for default judgment for 9:00 a.m. on July 14, 2016. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/9/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. The motion to appear by telephone (Dkt. No. 55) is TERMINATED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/28/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 1, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiff shall request the clerk enter the default of The Golden 1 Credit Union on or before 4/8/2016. Joint updated Case Management Statement due by 4/28/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/1/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
December 4, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 30 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Patient Accounting Service Center, LLC filed by Mary Ingram. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/4/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
October 27, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 27 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Ally Financial, Inc. Ally Financial, Inc. Response due 12/15/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/27/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingram v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ingram
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ramon Ramirez
Represented By: Alyssa Marie Staudinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Katherine Elisabeth Carlton Robinson
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seventh Ave.
Represented By: Judith Therese Sethna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashro, Inc.
Represented By: Judith Therese Sethna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden 1 Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patient Accounting Service Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?