Mountz, Inc. v. Northeast Industrial Bolting and Torque, LLC.

Plaintiff: Mountz, Inc.
Defendant: Northeast Industrial Bolting and Torque, LLC.
Case Number: 5:2015cv04538
Filed: October 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. James Donato adopting Report and Recommendations, Dkt. No. 33. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
November 14, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, Dkt. No. 23. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/14/2016. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
February 1, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/1/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mountz, Inc. v. Northeast Industrial Bolting and Torque, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountz, Inc.
Represented By: Donald L. Bartels
Represented By: J. Bruce McCubbrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Industrial Bolting and Torque, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?