Padayhag v. Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.

Plaintiff: Eric Padayhag
Defendant: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv04561
Filed: October 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 25 STIPULATED REQUEST TO TAKE OFF CALENDAR THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR FEBRUARY 18, 2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/9/2016. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
February 8, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 23 STIPULATED REQUEST TO TAKE OFF CALENDAR FOR FEBRUARY 18, 2016 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/8/2016. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
January 20, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 21 ). Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padayhag v. Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Padayhag
Represented By: Jason M. Erlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Zina Deldar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?