Towers v. Iger et al

Plaintiff: Eugene F. Towers
Defendant: Robert A. Iger, Alan Bergman, Edwin Catmull, James A. Rasulo, Thomas O. Staggs, Susan E. Arnold, John S. Chen, Jack Dorsey, Fred H. Langhammer, Aylwin B. Lewis, Monica C. Lozano, Robert W. Matschullat, Sheryl Sandberg, Orin C. Smith, Richard W. Cook and The Walt Disney Company
Case Number: 5:2015cv04609
Filed: September 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 65 DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/28/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
December 13, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 60 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/13/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
November 22, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 56 DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/22/2016.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
October 31, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 48 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF VERIFIED AMENDED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/31/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
March 22, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 25 PLAINTIFF'S AND 28 DEFENDANT'S SEALING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/22/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
December 11, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying administrative motion to relate case. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on December 11, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Towers v. Iger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene F. Towers
Represented By: Michael James Nicoud
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: Kevin Andrew Seely
Represented By: Gina Stassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Iger
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Bergman
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Catmull
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Rasulo
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas O. Staggs
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan E. Arnold
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John S. Chen
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Dorsey
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred H. Langhammer
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aylwin B. Lewis
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica C. Lozano
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Matschullat
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Sandberg
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orin C. Smith
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W. Cook
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Walt Disney Company
Represented By: Jack Patrick DiCanio
Represented By: Cliff C. Gardner
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?