Herrera v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Herrera
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc., Synchrony Bank, Les Schwab Tire Center, Inc., Elite Acceptance Corporation, Plains Commerce Bank, Kelkris Associates, Inc., Credit Bureau of Placer County, Inc., Credit Bureau Systems, Inc., North Valley Collection Bureau, RCA of Grass Valley, Inc., Stanislaus Credit Control Service, Inc. and Universal Recovery Corporation
Case Number: 5:2015cv04612
Filed: October 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT. Request for Clerk's Entry due by 7/28/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/7/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2016)
June 30, 2016 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING 94 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/30/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 27, 2016 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TERMINATING 73 CREDIT BUREAU SYSTEMS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT; AND ORDERING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANT CREDIT BUREAU SYSTEMS, INC. SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO EFFECT TIMELY SERVICE OF PROCESS. Show Cause Response due by 7/11/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/27/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
March 28, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 30 , 31 , 32 , 33 DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/28/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
March 2, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON 73 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/2/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
February 10, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING HEARINGS ON 30 , 31 , 32 , 33 DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 2/10/2016. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
January 25, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES; AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT A JOINT STIPULATED CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/25/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Herrera
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Terri R Brown
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Inc.
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: Raffi Kassabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Les Schwab Tire Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Acceptance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plains Commerce Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelkris Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Bureau of Placer County, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Bureau Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Valley Collection Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCA of Grass Valley, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanislaus Credit Control Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Recovery Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?