Watts v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jack Watts
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC and Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv04622
Filed: October 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 44 DEFENDANT DIVERSIFIED ADJUSTMENT SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/14/2016.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
July 11, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 33 DEFENDANT DIVERSIFIED ADJUSTMENT SERVICE, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/11/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
March 2, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES; AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT A JOINT STIPULATED CASE SCHEDULE. Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Con ference set for 10/26/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Jury Trial set for 11/13/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watts v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Watts
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?