Heller v. Adobe Systems, Inc.

Plaintiff: David Heller
Defendant: Adobe Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv04658
Filed: October 7, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 05:75
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DISMISSING CASE. Re: Dkt. No. 29 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
March 29, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Re: Dkt. No. 12 . Heller must move to amend the complaint with the court within 14 days. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
December 16, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and Adjust Certain Associated Deadlines Accordingly 14 . Case Management Statement due by 1/20/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2016 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/16/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heller v. Adobe Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Heller
Represented By: Richard James Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adobe Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Berta
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?