Kanellakopoulos v. Unimerica Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ioannis Kanellakopoulos
Defendant: Unimerica Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2015cv04674
Filed: October 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON 287 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL; AND DENYING 287 MOTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/8/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING 147 , 148 PARTIES' JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/2/2018. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER RE 209 JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING THE PROPOSED CHANGES TO THE JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/20/2018. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER GRANTING 140 PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL IN PART THE COURT'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER ISSUED JANUARY 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/18/2018. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 99 plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 99 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Seek Reconsideration. Defendant's response due by 11/3/2017. Plaintiff's reply due by 11/6/2017. Upon submission of the papers, this court may decide the matter without a hearing, or will advise of a hearing date and time if it determines that oral argument is necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/30/2017. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 73 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 3. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 58 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 2. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying 56 defendant's request for protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/14/2017. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER directing plaintiff to file response re 56 defendant's request for protective order. Plaintiff's response due by noon, 7/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/13/2017. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING 51 STIPULATION TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY AND OTHER PRETRIAL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/31/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 49 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 37 STIPULATED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/10/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kanellakopoulos v. Unimerica Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ioannis Kanellakopoulos
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Creitz
Represented By: Lisa Sharon Serebin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unimerica Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?