Silvia et al v. Verizon Communications, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Debbie Silvia and John W. Vieira
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon California, Inc., Engineering Associates, Inc. and EA Techinical Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv04677
Filed: October 8, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2017 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 111 Motion to Dismiss. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
January 20, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER No. 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/20/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
July 27, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 Request to Appear Telephonically filed by Verizon California, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/27/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 15, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Request to Appear Telephonically at Motion Hearing filed by Engineering Associates, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/15/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
July 8, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Request to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference filed by Engineering Associates, Inc. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/8/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
May 10, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE SCHEDULING ORDER re 18 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 10, 2016 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
May 4, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 40 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
March 18, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 7 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 10, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 32 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 10, 2016 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silvia et al v. Verizon Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Silvia
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Gregory
Represented By: Adam John Zapala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Vieira
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Gregory
Represented By: Adam John Zapala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon California, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron L. Agenbroad
Represented By: Allison Elizabeth Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Engineering Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Brian D. Bertossa
Represented By: Stephen R McCutcheon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EA Techinical Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?