Maranon v. Santa Clara Stadium Authority et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Maranon
Defendant: Santa Clara Stadium Authority, City of Santa Clara and Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC
Case Number: 5:2015cv04709
Filed: October 12, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 53 54 62 MEDICAL DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/13/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
April 24, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 38 MOTION TO AMEND AND VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/24/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
December 9, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 29 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/9/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
January 25, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PARTIES TO CONDUCT THE JOINT SITE INSPECTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/25/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maranon v. Santa Clara Stadium Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Maranon
Represented By: Tanya Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Clara Stadium Authority
Represented By: Kara Ann Abelson
Represented By: Matthew Stanley Conant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Clara
Represented By: Kara Ann Abelson
Represented By: Matthew Stanley Conant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forty Niners Stadium Management Company LLC
Represented By: Kara Ann Abelson
Represented By: Matthew Stanley Conant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?