Lee et al v. Retail Store Employee Building Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Maria W. Lee, Wen T. Lee and Lin Kou Lee
Defendant: Retail Store Employee Building Corporation, Casa Del Pueblo Apartment and Preservation Partners Mgmt Group, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv04768
Filed: October 15, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2017 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Telephonic Hearing re 166 Deposition Date of Wen T. Lee. Discovery hearing set for 8/24/107, 1:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/21/2017. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2017) Modified on 8/21/2017 (hrllc2, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2017 141 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting 136 Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
January 24, 2017 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part and Denying in Part 111 Motion to Dismiss; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 112 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
August 25, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Dismissing Plaintiff Lin Lee for Failure to Prosecute. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 08/25/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
August 5, 2016 93 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Judge Lucy Koh Granting 60 , 69 Motions to Dismiss as to Plaintiff Lin Lee and Order to Show Cause. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
July 6, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Judge Lucy Koh Granting 56 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 71 Stipulation to Dismiss; Adopting Report and Recommendations as to 79 Report and Recommendations; and Setting Briefing Schedule Regarding 60 and 69 Motions to Dismiss. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
June 21, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Reassignment to a District Judge; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 56 defendant Preservation Partners Management Group's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/21/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
June 9, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 64 plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time re 60 defendants' MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 6/23/2016. Reply due by 6/30/2016. Motion hearing co ntinued to 7/19/2016, 10:00 AM. As to defendant Preservation Partners Management Group, within 10 days from the date of this order, plaintiffs to file either a stipulated dismissal or request for dismissal and proposed order. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
May 11, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Request for Service by U.S. Marshals Service. Clerk shall issue summons. U.S. Marshal to serve summons, First Amended Complaint, any attachments, and this order on Barcelon Associates Management Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/11/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
April 6, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS. Defendants to appear for Show Cause Hearing set for 5/3/2016 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/6/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee et al v. Retail Store Employee Building Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria W. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wen T. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lin Kou Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retail Store Employee Building Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casa Del Pueblo Apartment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preservation Partners Mgmt Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?