Ferrari et al v. Natural Partner, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Lisa Francesca Ferrari and Joseph Michael Labrash
Defendant: Natural Partner, Inc., ProThera, Inc., Klaire Labs and Soho Flordis International
Case Number: 5:2015cv04787
Filed: October 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2017 94 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting With Prejudice in Part and Denying in Part 76 Motion to Dismiss. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2017 02:00 PM.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
August 23, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 48 Natural Partners's Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 49 ProThera Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
July 28, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 64 Substitution of Attorney. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/28/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
June 3, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING PRO BONO COUNSEL FOR LIMITED-SCOPE REPRESENTATION, re: 54 and 55 . Signed by Judge Honorable Lucy H. Koh on 06/03/2016. **(CC:KEVIN KNESTRICK)** (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016) (EMAIL COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PLAINTIFFS ON 6/3/2016) Modified on 6/3/2016 (sms, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Judge Lucy Koh Denying as Moot 8 Motion to Dismiss; Denying as Moot 15 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
January 4, 2016 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF NOTICE. Re: Dkt. No. 1 . All parties are asked to consent to or decline jurisdiction of a U.S. magistrate judge within 14 days. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/4/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrari et al v. Natural Partner, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Francesca Ferrari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Michael Labrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natural Partner, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProThera, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klaire Labs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soho Flordis International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?