Power Integrations, Inc. v. Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Power Integrations, Inc.
Defendant: Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation and Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation
Case Number: 5:2015cv04854
Filed: October 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY. All existing pretrial and trial deadlines and dates are vacated. The parties shall file a joint status report no later than one year from the date of this order and every 180 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/15/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 12, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY. The hearing scheduled for December 16, 2016, is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/12/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
November 28, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASE. Power Integrations, Inc. v. ON Semiconductor Corporation, Case No. 16-6371 BLF, is not related to Power Integrations, Inc. v. Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. et al., Case No. 15-4854 MMC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/28/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
October 11, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The initial case management conference is continued to November 18, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/11/16. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
August 10, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. The parties' ADR deadline will be addressed at the next Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 10, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
June 1, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION & ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled to August 26, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 1, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
April 28, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF J. PRESTON LONG PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 28, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 20, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-1(a). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 20, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
April 8, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. For the reasons stated by the Court on the record at the hearing, the motion to dismiss is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 8, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
March 31, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE ENTRY OF EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURT FOR HEARING PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER NO. 58. The parties shall contact the Deputy Clerk to arrange for access to the courtroom. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 31, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 8, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 8, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
February 26, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF CHARLES J. HAWKINS PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 26, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
February 16, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF PATRICK J. STAFFORD PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 16, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
November 20, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING POWER INTEGRATIONS' MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED. Case No. 15-4854 is related to Case No. 09-5235. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 20, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Power Integrations, Inc. v. Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Power Integrations, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Richard Headley
Represented By: Howard Glenn Pollack
Represented By: Neil A Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.
Represented By: Blair M Jacobs
Represented By: Christina Ann Ondrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation
Represented By: Blair M Jacobs
Represented By: Christina Ann Ondrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairchild (Taiwan) Corporation
Represented By: Blair M Jacobs
Represented By: Christina Ann Ondrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?