Standard Innovation Corporation v. LELOi AB et al

Plaintiff: Standard Innovation Corporation
Defendant: Lelo (Shanghai) Trading Co., Ltd. and Suzhou Armocon Technology Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2015cv04858
Filed: October 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2016 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 129 SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/25/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
December 8, 2015 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR DECEMBER 17, 2015. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/8/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
November 19, 2015 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 106 WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/19/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 6, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR TEMPOARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/6/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
October 21, 2015 85 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 57 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (cfelchak, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Standard Innovation Corporation v. LELOi AB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lelo (Shanghai) Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzhou Armocon Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standard Innovation Corporation
Represented By: Louis K. Bonham
Represented By: Robert P. Lord
Represented By: Lisa Erin Margonis
Represented By: Michael A. Molano
Represented By: Alan D. Rosenthal
Represented By: Peter Charles Schechter
Represented By: Tammy Jayk Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?