Centeno et al v. JV Orta's Rent-A-Fence et al
Plaintiff: Michael Centeno, Austin Tobia, Sergio Cervantez and Emmanuel Luis Fregoso
Defendant: JV Orta's Rent-A-Fence, Orta and Sons Fence Company Inc., Betty Orta and Carlos Torresday Orta
Case Number: 5:2015cv04995
Filed: October 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 34 Stipulation Dismissing Case. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/13/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2016)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER SETTING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/7/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE SCHEDULING ORDER re 11 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 9, 2016 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centeno et al v. JV Orta's Rent-A-Fence et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Centeno
Represented By: Huy Ngoc Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Tobia
Represented By: Huy Ngoc Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Cervantez
Represented By: Huy Ngoc Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Luis Fregoso
Represented By: Huy Ngoc Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JV Orta's Rent-A-Fence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orta and Sons Fence Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Orta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Torresday Orta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?