Ng et al v. US Bank Trustee, NA et al

Plaintiff: Mary Juliet Ng and Charles Chung Man Ng
Defendant: US Bank Trustee, NA and Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv04998
Filed: October 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2017 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 119 Motion Expunge Notice of Pendency of Action. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
December 8, 2016 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 91 Motion to Expunge Notice of Pendency of Action. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
November 30, 2016 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion for Attorney Fees. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 14, 2016 108 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MOTION HEARING re 88 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.,, US Bank, NA, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 88 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/14/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
October 26, 2016 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 88 Motion for Attorney's Fees. Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by November 2, 2016. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/26/2016. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
September 26, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 75 Motion to Dismiss without leave to amend. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
June 14, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 6/28/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/5/2016 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/14/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
May 26, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 47 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
April 22, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 55 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ng et al v. US Bank Trustee, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank Trustee, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Juliet Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Chung Man Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?