Phan v. Grand Bahama Cruise Line, LLC et al

Plaintiff: An Phan
Defendant: Grand Bahama Cruise Line, LLC, Cruise Operator, Inc., and Bahamas Paradise Cruise Line, LLC
Case Number: 5:2015cv05019
Filed: November 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 45 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT JURISIDCTIONAL DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/28/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
June 7, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 45 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT EXPEDITED JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
April 12, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 25 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
January 4, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 29 STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2016 11:00 AM.Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/4/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phan v. Grand Bahama Cruise Line, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Bahama Cruise Line, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cruise Operator, Inc.,
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Robert Samuel Boulter
Represented By: Richard Wayne Epstein
Represented By: Roy Taub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bahamas Paradise Cruise Line, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Backman
Represented By: Robert Samuel Boulter
Represented By: Richard Wayne Epstein
Represented By: Roy Taub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: An Phan
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Marc Lawrence Godino
Represented By: Mark Samuel Greenstone
Represented By: Michael Joe Jaurigue
Represented By: Abigail Ameri Zelenski
Represented By: David Zelenski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?