Jordan v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Trent Jordan
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, IQ Data International, Inc., AFNI, Inc., Rash Curtis & Associates and Alliance One, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv05117
Filed: November 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2016 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. The parties are ordered to appear on 12/1/2016 at 10:00 AM to show cause why the case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). On or before 11/23/2016, the parties shall file a joint statement in response. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/4/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
August 1, 2016 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. 1.The parties shall comply with the deadlines provided in the Case Management Order filed on 6/20/2016 83 . 2. In addition, the parties shall complete mediation by the deadline provided in the order fi led on 7/14/2016 89 . 3. The Further Case Management Conference scheduled for 8/4/2016 is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on 9/8/2016. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before 9/1/2016 which provides, inter alia, a deadline by which a dismissal will be filed for any defendant for which a Notice of Settlement has been filed but has not been dismissed prior to that date. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/1/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 18, 2016 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 91 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant AFNI, Inc. ONLY. The Clerk shall terminate Defendant AFNI, Inc. from this action ONLY. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/18/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
July 14, 2016 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The hearing scheduled for 7/21/2016 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/14/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
July 12, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The parties are ordered to appear before the Honorable Edward J. Davila on 7/21/2016, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom No. 1, 5th Floor, San Jose to show cause why the court should not impose any and all appropriate sanctions, incl uding monetary sanctions or dismissal of this action, on the parties, or any of them, for willful disobedience of a court order. The parties may file a response to this order demonstrating good cause why sanctions should not be imposed on or before 7 /15/2016. In doing so, however, they must (1) explain their failure to comply with the original deadline to file one of the ADR forms, and (2) must also file one of the forms contemplated by the June 20th Order. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/12/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
April 22, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion to Dismiss. Any amended complaint must be filed on or before 5/9/2016. All other motions to dismiss are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as moot. The court also declines to set a case management schedule at this time. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/22/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 21, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 64 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (of Defendant AllianceOne, Inc.) filed by Trent Jordan. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/21/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trent Jordan
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Terri R Brown
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc
Represented By: Sara Janett Quinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Sara Janett Quinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IQ Data International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFNI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rash Curtis & Associates
Represented By: Amanda Nicole Griffith
Represented By: Amanda Nicole Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance One, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?