Pecha v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jason Pecha
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., Kelkris Associates, Inc., Coast to Coast Financial Solutions, Inc., Wells Fargo Card Services, Inc., Wells Fargo & Company and TD Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2015cv05132
Filed: November 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT. Request for Clerk's Entry due by 7/28/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/7/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2016)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER (1) SUBMITTING 51 DEFENDANT TD BANK USA, N.A.S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT AND VACATING HEARING; (2) GRANTING 51 MOTION TO DISMISS; AND (3) TERMINATING AS MOOT 54 DEFENDANT TD BANK USA, N.A.S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/23/2016.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING 19 DEFENDANT KELKRIS ASSOCIATES' MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/28/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/2/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON 19 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 2/10/2016. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pecha v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Pecha
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelkris Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Nicole Griffith
Represented By: Andrew M. Steinheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast to Coast Financial Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Card Services, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Janett Quinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Sara Janett Quinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?