Lee v. JPMorgan Chase Bank

Plaintiff: Jason Chan Lee
Defendant: MTC Financial Inc. dba Trustee Corps and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A
Case Number: 5:2015cv05215
Filed: November 13, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/14/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
June 28, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 33 REQUEST FOR STAY. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
May 4, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 22 Motion to Dismiss COMPLAINT filed by MTC Financial. Reset Deadlines as to 22 Motion to Dismiss COMPLAINT. Plaintiff's Opposition is due by 7/15/2016. Defendant's Reply is due by 7/22/2016. Motion Hearing s et for 8/5/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/26/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2016 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/4/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
March 24, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 20 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Jason Chan Lee. It is ordered that Counsel Charles T. Marshall is substituted in as new counsel for Plaintiff and Mark W. Lapham is substituted out. CLERK PLEASE UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION FOR PLAINTIFF'S NEW COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/24/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
February 10, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 16 Stipulation for a 90-Day Stay, and to Vacate and Reset MTC Financial, Inc. dba Trustee Corps' Motion to Dismiss hearing to a Date After the Stay filed by Jason Chan Lee. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/10/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. JPMorgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Chan Lee
Represented By: Charles Thomas Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial Inc. dba Trustee Corps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Represented By: Sanjay Mohan Nangia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?