Jarnail Singh Dhindsa v. Avis Budget Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jarnail Singh Dhindsa
Defendant: Avis Budget Group, Inc., American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Ford Motor Company, Dave McMillan and Anna Livermore
Case Number: 5:2015cv05233
Filed: November 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/13/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 9, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to File Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/9/16. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
February 3, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/3/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarnail Singh Dhindsa v. Avis Budget Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avis Budget Group, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Nicole Fu
Represented By: Patrick H. Hicks
Represented By: Sandra Jean McMullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania
Represented By: Edward James Tafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: H. Grant Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave McMillan
Represented By: Amanda Nicole Fu
Represented By: Patrick H. Hicks
Represented By: Sandra Jean McMullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Livermore
Represented By: Amanda Nicole Fu
Represented By: Patrick H. Hicks
Represented By: Sandra Jean McMullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarnail Singh Dhindsa
Represented By: Rattan Dev S Dhaliwal
Represented By: Gabriel S. Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?