Jisser et al v. City of Palo Alto Featured Case

Plaintiff: Toufic Jisser, Eva Jisser and Toufic and Eva Jisser Revocable Trust
Defendant: City of Palo Alto
Case Number: 5:2015cv05295
Filed: November 19, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2016 32 Featured Case JUDGMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that judgment is entered in favor of Defendant. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/24/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 24, 2016 31 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 Motion to Dismiss. Judgment will be entered in favor of the Defendant and the Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/24/2016. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
May 26, 2016 30 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing held on 5/26/2016 re 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Palo Alto. The Court takes the matter under submission. The Court to issue further order following hearing. Appearances:Attorney(s) for Plaintiff(s): Larry Salzman Attorneys(s) for Defendant(s): Kevin Siegel Court Reporter Name: 43 minutes, 9:08 - 9:51 AM Total Time in Court: Summer Fisher This is a text only Minute Entry. There is no document associated with this entry. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/26/2016)
March 3, 2016 29 Featured Case ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation Granting Stay of Discovery, ADR and Case Management Deadlines. The Court will reset the Case Management Conference in the order addressing the pending motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/3/2016.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
March 1, 2016 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Discovery, ADR, and Case Management Deadlines filed by Eva Jisser, Toufic Jisser, Toufic and Eva Jisser Revocable Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Salzman, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
January 29, 2016 27 REPLY (re 20 MOTION to Dismiss ) Defendant City of Palo Alto's Reply iso Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed byCity of Palo Alto. (Siegel, Kevin) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
January 13, 2016 26 RESPONSE (re 20 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byEva Jisser, Toufic Jisser, Toufic and Eva Jisser Revocable Trust. (Salzman, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
January 12, 2016 25 Request for Judicial Notice [AMENDMENT TO DKT # 21 Request for Judicial Notice iso Defendant City of Palo Alto's Notice of Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss; Memo of points and authorities iso Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by City of Palo Alto. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C Petition for Writ of Mandate and Complaint, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Siegel, Kevin) (Filed on 1/12/2016) Modified on 1/12/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/12/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2016 24 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Extending Deadlines for Opposition and Reply re 23 Stipulation, filed by Toufic and Eva Jisser Revocable Trust, Eva Jisser, Toufic Jisser, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 20 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant City of Palo Alto's Notice of Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss . Response due by 1/13/2016. Reply due by 1/29/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/5/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
December 30, 2015 23 STIPULATION re 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eva Jisser, Toufic Jisser, Toufic and Eva Jisser Revocable Trust. (Salzman, Lawrence) (Filed on 12/30/2015) Modified on 1/11/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2015 22 Proposed Order re 20 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Palo Alto. (Siegel, Kevin) (Filed on 12/22/2015) Modified on 1/11/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2015 21 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see 25 Request for Judicial Notice filed by City of Palo Alto. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2*** ERROR *** insufficient data for an image Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 *** ERROR BLANK PAGES*** insufficient data for an image Exhibit E, # 6*** ERROR BLANK *** insufficient data for an image Exhibit F, # 7 *** ERROR BLANK PAGES *** insufficient data for an image Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 20 ) (Siegel, Kevin) (Filed on 12/22/2015) Modified on 1/11/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/12/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/12/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2015 20 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof filed by City of Palo Alto. Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 1/5/2016. Replies due by 1/12/2016. (Siegel, Kevin) (Filed on 12/22/2015) Modified on 1/11/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2015 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by City of Palo Alto Defendant City of Palo Alto's Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Siegel, Kevin) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
December 15, 2015 18 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 17 Stipulation filed by City of Palo Alto. Response due 12/22/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/15/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 11, 2015 17 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, Stipulation Extending Deadline for Defendant City of Palo Alto to File Responsive Pleading filed by City of Palo Alto. (Siegel, Kevin) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
December 9, 2015 16 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2016. Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
December 9, 2015 15 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 12/9/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015) Modified on 12/9/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2015 14 *** Please Disregard. See Docket 15 *** ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015) Modified on 12/9/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/9/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2015 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 8, 2015 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City of Palo Alto.. (Siegel, Kevin) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 8, 2015 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Drake Siegel (Siegel, Kevin) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 2, 2015 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Toufic Jisser, Toufic and Eva Jisser Revocable Trust, Eva Jisser. City of Palo Alto served on 11/20/2015, answer due 12/11/2015. (Salzman, Lawrence) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
November 30, 2015 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eva Jisser, Toufic Jisser, Toufic and Eva Jisser Revocable Trust re 8 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Salzman, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 30, 2015 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eva Jisser, Toufic Jisser, Toufic and Eva Jisser Revocable Trust.. (Salzman, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 19, 2015 7 Summons Issued as to City of Palo Alto. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 19, 2015 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/16/2016. Case Management Conference set for 2/23/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 19, 2015 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 12/3/2015. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 19, 2015 4 NOTICE by Eva Jisser, Toufic Jisser, Toufic and Eva Jisser Revocable Trust of Pendency of Other Actions (Salzman, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 19, 2015 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Eva Jisser, Toufic Jisser, Toufic and Eva Jisser Revocable Trust identifying Other Affiliate Buena Vista MHP Residents Association for Eva Jisser, Toufic Jisser, Toufic and Eva Jisser Revocable Trust. (Disclosure of Non-Party Interested Entities or Persons) (Salzman, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 19, 2015 2 Proposed Summons. (Salzman, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 19, 2015 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Federal Civil Rights Under 42 U.S.C. sec. 1983 and California State Law (Cal. Gov't Code sec. 65863); Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10004792.). Filed byToufic Jisser, Toufic and Eva Jisser Revocable Trust, Eva Jisser. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Salzman, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/19/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jisser et al v. City of Palo Alto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toufic Jisser
Represented By: Jan David Breemer
Represented By: Lawrence George Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Jisser
Represented By: Jan David Breemer
Represented By: Lawrence George Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toufic and Eva Jisser Revocable Trust
Represented By: Jan David Breemer
Represented By: Lawrence George Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Palo Alto
Represented By: Terence J. Howzell
Represented By: Kevin Drake Siegel
Represented By: Molly Suzanne Stump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?