Naveed et al v. City of San Jose

Plaintiff: Mohammad Badar Naveed and Humza Ahmad
Defendant: City Of San Jose, San Jose Police Dept, Doug Tran, Elizabeth Ornelas, Jonathan Koenig, Paula Talus, Edgar Nava and Martin Wallace
Case Number: 5:2015cv05298
Filed: November 19, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING 47 Second Stipulated Dismissal. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/25/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
January 25, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY DEADLINES; ORDER AS MODIFIED re: 40 : Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off due 3/31/2017; Expert Discovery Disclosure due 4/12/2017; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due 4/26/2017; Expert Discovery Cutoff due 5/5/2017. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/25/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
August 5, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER for Jury Trial by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Conference set for 6/13/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Jury Trial shall begin 7/11/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
June 14, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Deadline for Responsive Pleading and Case Management Conference by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Case Management Conference is set for 7/26/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. A joint Case Management Statement is due by 7/19/2016. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
May 23, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part 20 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
January 19, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE SCHEDULING ORDER re 16 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 19, 2016 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naveed et al v. City of San Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of San Jose
Represented By: J. Richard Doyle
Represented By: Nora Valerie Frimann
Represented By: Ardell Johnson
Represented By: Alan Robert Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Jose Police Dept
Represented By: J. Richard Doyle
Represented By: Nora Valerie Frimann
Represented By: Alan Robert Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Tran
Represented By: Alan Robert Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Ornelas
Represented By: J. Richard Doyle
Represented By: Nora Valerie Frimann
Represented By: Alan Robert Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Koenig
Represented By: J. Richard Doyle
Represented By: Nora Valerie Frimann
Represented By: Alan Robert Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Talus
Represented By: J. Richard Doyle
Represented By: Nora Valerie Frimann
Represented By: Alan Robert Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Nava
Represented By: J. Richard Doyle
Represented By: Nora Valerie Frimann
Represented By: Alan Robert Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Wallace
Represented By: Alan Robert Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Badar Naveed
Represented By: Steven Michael Berki
Represented By: M. Jeffery Kallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humza Ahmad
Represented By: Steven Michael Berki
Represented By: M. Jeffery Kallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?