Acosta et al v. City of Salinas

Plaintiff: Rita Acosta, Bessie Taylor, Van Gresham, Cherie Hernandez, John Lerma, Joseph Blains and William Silas
Defendant: City of Salinas
Case Number: 5:2015cv05415
Filed: November 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2016 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Re: Dkt. No. 1 . Plaintiffs have until 5/11/2016, to show cause why judgment should not be entered against them. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/29/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 13, 2016 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Re: Dkt. No. 72 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
March 30, 2016 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PROHIBITING FURTHER BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Re: Dkt. Nos. 72 88 89 . Briefing is now complete. Both parties are notified that no more briefing or declarations will be accepted without advance approval by the Court. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/30/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
March 7, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Judge Lucy Koh Denying 57 Motion for Extension of Time to File; Denying 58 Ex Parte Application; Denying 58 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
March 4, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Regarding Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 03/04/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 3, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 03/03/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
February 29, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Judge Lucy Koh Denying as Moot 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Order Denying 41 Motion to Continue. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 17, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Judge Lucy Koh granting 31 Motion for Leave to File Supplementary Material and Directing Defendant to File Response (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 11, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Directing Plaintiffs to Respond to 31 Motion for Leave to File Supplementary Material. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 02/11/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
January 14, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting 20 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 01/14/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
November 25, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Denying Without Prejudice Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 11/25/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta et al v. City of Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Acosta
Represented By: Alisa L Hartz
Represented By: Joshua S. Meltzer
Represented By: Bradley S. Phillips
Represented By: Anthony David Prince
Represented By: Anne Kendrick Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie Taylor
Represented By: Alisa L Hartz
Represented By: Joshua S. Meltzer
Represented By: Bradley S. Phillips
Represented By: Anthony David Prince
Represented By: Anne Kendrick Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Gresham
Represented By: Alisa L Hartz
Represented By: Joshua S. Meltzer
Represented By: Bradley S. Phillips
Represented By: Anthony David Prince
Represented By: Anne Kendrick Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie Hernandez
Represented By: Alisa L Hartz
Represented By: Joshua S. Meltzer
Represented By: Bradley S. Phillips
Represented By: Anthony David Prince
Represented By: Anne Kendrick Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lerma
Represented By: Alisa L Hartz
Represented By: Joshua S. Meltzer
Represented By: Bradley S. Phillips
Represented By: Anthony David Prince
Represented By: Anne Kendrick Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Blains
Represented By: Alisa L Hartz
Represented By: Joshua S. Meltzer
Represented By: Bradley S. Phillips
Represented By: Anthony David Prince
Represented By: Anne Kendrick Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Silas
Represented By: Alisa L Hartz
Represented By: Joshua S. Meltzer
Represented By: Bradley S. Phillips
Represented By: Anthony David Prince
Represented By: Anne Kendrick Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?