Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE. LTD. v. Acer Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE. LTD.
Defendant: Acer Inc. and Acer America Corp.
Case Number: 5:2015cv05427
Filed: November 25, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Referring Judge: Laurel Beeler
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSAL CASE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/15/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
February 11, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING ALL DEADLINES BY SIXTY DAYS filed by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE. LTD. Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/11/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
January 22, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding First Amended Complaint filed by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE. LTD.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/22/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 5, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE. LTD. filed by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE. LTD. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/5/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
December 30, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR ALL COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT THE JANUARY 5, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE. LTD. DENIED. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/30/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
December 23, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 1 Complaint, Response Date and Case Management Conference filed by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE. LTD. Granted in part and denied in part. CMC remains set for 1/5/16 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/23/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 10, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Administrative Relief filed by Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE. LTD. Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2015. Case Management Conference reset from 1/14/2016 to 1/5/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/10/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE. LTD. v. Acer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE. LTD.
Represented By: Robert John Artuz
Represented By: Matthew C. Holohan
Represented By: Kristopher Lane Reed
Represented By: David E. Sipiora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer America Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?