Opara v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Harris Opara
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Cashcall, Inc., HSBC Bank USA, National Association, United Auto Credit Corporation, Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC and Equifax, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv05546
Filed: December 3, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/25/2016 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 8/18/2016. All other pretrial deadlines and hearing dates are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/28/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
May 17, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION. Because all parties to the prior stipulation addressing alternative dispute resolution have been dismissed, Plaintiff and Defendants HSBC Bank USA, National Association and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. shall, within ten days of the date this order is filed, meet and confer in an effort to reach an agreement on some form of alternative dispute resolution, and within that same timeframe file either a stipulation embodying their agreement or the form entitled Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/17/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
March 18, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 44 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by United Auto Credit Corporation. Counsel shall arrange for a telephonic appearance through CourtCall. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/18/2016. (Correction of 49 PDF) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 15, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 42 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Harris Opara. Cashcall, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/15/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Opara v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harris Opara
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. Ferguson
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cashcall, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Auto Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?