Corzine v. Maytag Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Julie Corzine
Defendant: Maytag Corporation and Whirlpool Corporation
Case Number: 5:2015cv05764
Filed: December 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 57 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND TERMINATING 58 MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/2/2016. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
June 29, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/29/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
June 10, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/10/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
May 13, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADVANCING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO MAY 26, 2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/13/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corzine v. Maytag Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Corzine
Represented By: Jaclyn Louise Anderson
Represented By: Kenneth S. Kasdan
Represented By: Graham Bruce LippSmith
Represented By: Frank A. Perez
Represented By: Scott James Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maytag Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan A. Eldredge
Represented By: Clement L. Glynn
Represented By: Michael N. Mulvania
Represented By: Andrew M. Unthank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?