Khokhar v. Yousuf et al

Plaintiff: Mohammad Minhaj Khokhar
Defendant: Amjad Yousuf, Zarina Amjad, Muhammad Ahmad Amjad, Mohammad Abdullah Amjad, Kashif Mahmood, Marhaba Travels and Money Changers and Zamzam Builders & Developers
Case Number: 5:2015cv06043
Filed: December 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Show Cause Response due by 9/6/2017. Signed by Judge Saundra B Armstrong on 8/16/17. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
May 11, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 17-cv-01769-HRL and 15-cv-06043-LB signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/11/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
July 25, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. To allow time for the plaintiff to file a default-judgment motion, the court vacates the case-management conference now set for July 28 and resets it for October 13 at 9:30 a.m. The plaintiff may notice the default-judgment motion for an earlier date. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/25/2016. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khokhar v. Yousuf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Minhaj Khokhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amjad Yousuf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zarina Amjad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muhammad Ahmad Amjad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Abdullah Amjad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kashif Mahmood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marhaba Travels and Money Changers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zamzam Builders & Developers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?