ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Google Inc.
Miscellaneous: Palo Alto Research, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015mc80101
Filed: March 26, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2015 31 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL filed by Google Inc.. (Malecek, Michael) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
August 26, 2015 30 STATUS REPORT by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Timothy Chao, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Malecek, Michael) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 26, 2015 29 STATUS REPORT by Palo Alto Research, Inc.. (Harradine, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 11, 2015 28 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING STATUS OF CASE. The parties must provide a status by August 31, 2015. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/11/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
June 1, 2015 27 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey J Harradine (Harradine, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
April 23, 2015 26 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS 25 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 22, 2015 25 MOTION to Stay (Agreed Motion to Stay Proceedings) filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 5/6/2015. Replies due by 5/13/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Malecek, Michael) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
April 21, 2015 24 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. 19 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
April 21, 2015 23 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE 15-mc-80101 NC with 15-mc-80105 PSG. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/21/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
April 21, 2015 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Document should be filed and docketed as a motion with a proposed order. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 22 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Google Inc. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
April 17, 2015 22 RESPONSE (re 19 MOTION to Intervene ) Google Inc.'s Agreement to Intervenor ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.'s Request to Stay Proceedings filed byGoogle Inc.. (Malecek, Michael) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
April 10, 2015 21 RESPONSE (re 10 MOTION to Compel Non-Party Palo Alto Research Center Inc. to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena ) filed byContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Radu Lelutiu, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16)(Estremera, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
April 10, 2015 20 RESPONSE (re 10 MOTION to Compel Non-Party Palo Alto Research Center Inc. to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena ) filed byPalo Alto Research, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey J. Harradine, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Harradine, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
April 10, 2015 19 MOTION to Intervene filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 4/24/2015. Replies due by 5/1/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Estremera, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
April 10, 2015 18 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Jeffrey J. Harradine Pro Hac Vice 12 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
April 10, 2015 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Prieb Estremera (Estremera, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
April 7, 2015 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 15 MOTION to Relate Case (Malecek, Michael) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
April 7, 2015 15 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Malecek, Michael) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
March 30, 2015 14 Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Local Rule 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Palo Alto Research, Inc.. (Maselli, Samuel) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 30, 2015 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Joseph Maselli (Maselli, Samuel) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 27, 2015 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey J. Harradine ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9398622.) filed by In Re: Subpoena to Palo Alto Research Center Inc. (Harradine, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/27/2015) Modified text to add attorney's name only on 3/30/2015 (srmS, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2015 11 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 9 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7, # 2 Exhibit 8, # 3 Exhibit 9, # 4 Exhibit 10, # 5 Exhibit 13, # 6 Exhibit 15, # 7 Exhibit 16, # 8 Exhibit 17, # 9 Exhibit 20)(Malecek, Michael) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 27, 2015 10 MOTION to Compel Non-Party Palo Alto Research Center Inc. to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 4/10/2015. Replies due by 4/17/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Timothy Chao, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Proposed Order, # 24 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Malecek, Michael) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 26, 2015 9 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Edward J. Davila GRANTING 7 Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Its Motion To Compel Palo Alto Research Center To Produce Documents In Response To Subpoena and Certain Exhibits Thereto. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 26, 2015 8 Declaration of Timothy Chao in Support of 7 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle Inc. (Related document(s) 7 ) (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 26, 2015 7 Google's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Motion to Compel Palo Alto Research Center to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena and Certain Exhibits in Support of Google's Motion filed by Google Inc. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 26, 2015 6 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Edward J. Davila DENYING 1 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 26, 2015 5 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings by Google Inc. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 26, 2015 4 Google's Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Google Inc. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 26, 2015 3 Proposed Order re 1 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Google Inc. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 26, 2015 2 Declaration of Timothy Chao in Support of 1 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle Inc. (Related document(s) 1 ) (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 26, 2015 1 Google's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Its Motion to Compel Palo Alto Research Center to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena and Certain Exhibits in Support of Google's Motion filed by Google Inc. (srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Prieb Estremera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Timothy K. Chao
Represented By: Michael Joseph Malecek, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Palo Alto Research, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey J Harradine
Represented By: Samuel Joseph Maselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?