Synchronoss Technologies, Inc. v. Egnyte, Inc.

Plaintiff: Synchronoss Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Egnyte, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv00120
Filed: January 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2017 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 76 Stipulated Protective Order. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 10, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information for Patent Litigation filed by Synchronoss Technologies, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/10/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
January 27, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting (65) Stipulation in Case 3:16-cv-00120-HSG; (78) in Case 3:16-cv-02026-HSG to Continue Case. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
March 15, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 49 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Withdraw Counsel Andrew M. Grodin.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
February 25, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re Bock, Joel.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
February 24, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re Maheshwari, Shailendra.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
February 17, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re Goetzel, Dwayne (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synchronoss Technologies, Inc. v. Egnyte, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synchronoss Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: JOEL NATHAN BOCK
Represented By: Joel N. Bock
Represented By: Sarah S Eskandari
Represented By: Andrew Marc Grodin
Represented By: Mark Lee Hogge
Represented By: Nicholas Hunt Jackson
Represented By: Shailendra K Maheshwari
Represented By: Anne K Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Egnyte, Inc.
Represented By: Eric I. Abraham
Represented By: Ryan T. Beard
Represented By: Dwayne K. Goetzel
Represented By: Eric B. Meyertons
Represented By: Christina Lynn Saveriano
Represented By: Neil Arthur Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?