Ryan et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Nancy D. Ryan and Shannon Ryan McIlvain
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2016cv00164
Filed: January 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:6702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying 75 Motion to Set Aside Judgment.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying 61 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 62 Motion for Summary Judgment. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying 27 Motion for Leave to File. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy D. Ryan
Represented By: Gerald Bingham Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Ryan McIlvain
Represented By: Gerald Bingham Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: William Carl Hankla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?