Openwave Messaging, Inc. v. Open-Xchange, Inc.

Plaintiff: Openwave Messaging, Inc.
Defendant: Open-Xchange, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv00253
Filed: January 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2017 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 91 STIPULATION to continue deadlines re 88 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 7/21/2017. Reply due by 8/2/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/06/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
May 30, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 STIPULATION. Close of Fact Discovery: 7/28/2017. Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2017. Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 11/6/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2018 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 3/5/2018 08:30 AM, both in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/30/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
October 28, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 50 Motion to Dismiss. The motion to dismiss Counterclaims 3 through 7, to strike Counterclaim 1 and to strike Affirmative Defenses 9 and 15 through 18 is DENIED. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
September 2, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING TIME FOR OPEN-XCHANGE, INC. TO RESPOND TO OPENWAVE MESSAGING, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS AND STRIKE AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING DATE granting 51 STIPULATION. Deadlines and hearings reset as to 50 MOTION to Dismiss.Response due by 9/13/2016. Reply due by 9/20/2016. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/02/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
May 9, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 18 MOTION TO DISMISS IN PART. Openwave's Copyright and Lanham Act claims are DISMISSED with leave to amend. Open Xchange's motion to dismiss is DENIED in all other respects. Openwave shall have twenty days to amend. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/09/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Openwave Messaging, Inc. v. Open-Xchange, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Openwave Messaging, Inc.
Represented By: Ian Ballon
Represented By: Cathleen Donohoe
Represented By: David Michael Lisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Open-Xchange, Inc.
Represented By: Rodger R. Cole
Represented By: Todd Richard Gregorian
Represented By: Jennifer Lloyd Kelly
Represented By: Sapna S. Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?