Nemcik v. Mills et al

Plaintiff: Tanya Nemcik
Defendant: Mills and Georgia Ku
Case Number: 5:2016cv00322
Filed: January 20, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2017 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 105 , 111 , 114 MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND 103 MOTION TO STRIKE; AND DENYING 127 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/30/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
April 24, 2017 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 126 MOTION REQUESTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/24/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
August 16, 2016 92 Opinion or Order of the Court OMNIBUS ORDER REGARDING 40 , 43 , 50 , 51 , 59 , 75 , 84 PENDING MOTIONS BY DEFENDANTS TO DISMISS OR STRIKE THE FAC AND BY PLAINTIFF FOR A STAY AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/16/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
August 5, 2016 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 84 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND/OR PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/5/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
April 22, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM MAY 5, 2016 TO AUGUST 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/22/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 12, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 28 OBJECTION OF INCORRECT CLASSIFICATION OF CIVIL CASE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/12/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
March 30, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DETERMINING CASES ARE NOT RELATED. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/30/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
March 21, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 14 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/21/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER That Case Be Reassigned to a District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/21/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nemcik v. Mills et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Nemcik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Ku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?