Yahoo! Inc. v. Kudelski SA et al

Plaintiff: Yahoo! Inc.
Defendant: Kudelski SA and OpenTV, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv00349
Filed: January 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 27, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE 29 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/27/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 19, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION to Continue CMC and for Extension to Respond 27 . Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/19/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
April 1, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AS MODIFIED GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference 17 . Case Management Statement including defendants' consent or declination due by 6/8/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/1/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yahoo! Inc. v. Kudelski SA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yahoo! Inc.
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Miller
Represented By: Clement S. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kudelski SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpenTV, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?