Ryan Corley et al v. Google, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ryan Corley, Samuel Frank, Nicholas Corpuz, Bianca Edwards, Vienna Alvarez, Casimir Lyszczarczyk, Jasmeet Jernaill, Quinn Hatoff, Matt Baker, Shannon Levis, Jordan Smith, Carleigh Madden, Chelsea Liebowitz, Sean Martin, Asher McGuffin, Erica Cortez, Samuel Tall, Geoff Schuyler, Christian Carrillo, Daniel Brog, Ellen Howes, Nicholas Hall, Gregory Zoeller, James Feng, Austin Herry, Charlee Akina, Timothy Irvine, Cristina Swift, Michaella Borges, Brandon Arachikavitz, Antonio Lamv, Hannah Wilson, Todd Michael, Alex Goldklang, Darlene Reilley, Phillip Dove, Eric Lujan, Sierra Zang, Ryan King, Zachary Ouellette, Ryan Flynn, Shannon Fouts, Kriya Issa Velasco, Sean Ross, Nathanael Pickslay, Allyn Yu, William Dormann, Eli Davis, Jonathan Van Ness, Krista Drummond, Emily Schapka, Nicholas Wiese, David Sherman, Joseph Miller, Amber Diluzio, Daniel Lopez, Adam Leotta, Anton Fedorov, Rim Berhane, Nina Johal, Danielle Delbert, Kristian Talley, Sandra Childress, Alec Konstantin, Myles Scolnick, Joseph Johns, Steven Mach, Hillary Dawsey, David Frailey, Amanda McClintock, Yesenia Jameson, Daniel Osorio, Christopher Barnard, Daniel Lecours, Ashley Rits, Mark Dalgaard, Jordan Colclasure, Matthew Sample, Layton Cox, Travis Murphy, David Liu, Robert Thyberg, Gustavo Jauregui, Reed Showalter, Joseph Danehower, Robert Wainblat, Dennis Peterson, Jesse Bonelli, Stella Wilson-Frey, Brandon Flannery, Edward Benitez, Alyssa Mehl, Kevin Park, Norma Ramos, Andrew Grazioli, Rajan Gill, Sandeep Verma, Christine Schmitt, Christian Reed, Rhonda La Grande, Remy Sarhan, Cody Trevillian, Matthew Molzahn, Isaac Root, Siri Kirin Khalsa, Joseph Julio Rivera, Megan Martucci, Randy Cherland, Nicole Niebrzydowski, Ardena Saarinen, Rachel Castiglione, John Rogers, Morgan Smith, William Mebane, Liban Aden, Sebastian Swae-Shampine, Pedro Venzor, Vincent Dirienzo, Cynthia Yip, Sara Paull, Peter Griffis, Cassandra Leasure, Joseph Kayaleh, Kenneth Duckworth, Andrew King, Nicholas Mokover, Joshua Wright, Royce Kirk, Hannah Remis, Matthew Freifeld, Jake Scheps, James Chiocchio, Paul Richter, James Gillooley, John Buell, Elias Luna, Joseph Smeeding, Rebecca Hassinger, Evgenia Royter, Tammy Tan, Meagan Chamberlain, Sarah Rittenour, Polly Varize, Robert Berry, Leonardo Gonzalez, Kelsey Fahey, Lauren Hebert, Alvaro Mendizabal, Melissa Bates, Noah Baily, Patrick Bergerson, Kimberly Flores, Erica Leyva Arenas, Jason McQuade, Forrest Bashaw, Amy Zimmerman, Brett Chamberlin, Robert Farrar, Deborah Davis, Alexandria Foster, Nelson Hernandez, Grant Olscamp, Jaclyn Weinstein, Carl Evans, Samuel Cavazos, Peter Broski, Kathryn Robison, Kevin Shih, Jerrelle Guy, Matthew Phillips, Rhiannon Bezore, Thomas McCann, Kyle Mendenhall, Juliet Deamicis, Robert Saeman, Charles Fukai, Brandon Hodges, Archavanich Kawmongkolsi, Octav Dragoi, Danielle Ryder, Alexandra Kurtz, Etienne Thach, Vanessa Tait, Elin Hervall, Devon Henry, Christine Ondris, Jay Reddy, Samir Shah, Zina Ellis, Joseph Greenbaum, Maya Wagoner, Evan Layman, Colton Emel, Cory Hill, Frank Benitez, Brian Pybas, Yevgeniy Shuster, Skylar Florian, Kevin Chaney, Max Brawer, Lindsay Payne, John Wiltse, David Skarbowski, Spencer Neiman, Helen Li, Rosemary La Grua, Chelsea Whitman, Ryan Burke, Conor O'Brien, Mary Garcia, Bryan Leddy, Samir Gupta, Saul Winer, Nicholas Hoyt, Maxwell Denny, Talia Avisar, Ignacio Mendez-Nunez, Jacob Winkler, Melanie Redd, Justin Emery, Luke Anderson, David O'Connell, Signe Loving, Benjamin Mabie, Jessica Golden, Audrey Wittrup, Moshe Admon, Aunna Elrod, June Vutrano, Meighan Taylor, Rachel Ett, Omeed Atefi, Cory Zapatka, Steve Ramirez, Daniel Elkus, Derek Grosshart, Michael Hall, Shannon Mehaffey, Eric Haviland, Noranda Brown, Zachary Finch, Patricio Brito, Lewis Solow-Collins, Mitchell Heschke, Ryan Millman, Zachari Daquioag, Aisana Aitzhanova, Alexadner Stoffel, William Major, Benjamin Lesea-Pringle, Erica Siu, Daniel Diaz, B. Kim, Laurel Rain, Murtaza Jafferji, Jonathan Chen, Jay Ram, Lillian DiCarlo, Grant Bronsdon, Tarun Koshy, Thomas Chavez, Thomas Schmitt, Arielle Rahmanan, David Ruelas, Dax Crocker, Javier Aguirre, David Baroody, Barbara Brown, Aaron Kenny, Irene Pinon, Justin O'Hare, Dara Rosenkrantz, Jessica Klix, Kevin Saxman, Sean Draper, Corinne Foley, Sergey Lobatch, Nicole Wonderly, Michael Easterby, Michael Geyer, Edgar Portillo, Jessica Giusti, Tyler Searls, Sally Hu, Zachary Stamplis, Brittany Smith, Kailey-Alyssa Tucker, Sean Roper, Tracelyn McGuire, Rex Tai, Jacob Wunsh, Martha Letchinger, Karina Valencia, Stephen D'Addio, Kyle Picha, Katherine Cannon, Rory Strahan-Mauk, Keyhan Moini, Harrison Smith, Deborah Tackett, Joanna Titus, Janice Knight, Gregory Mozdyniewicz, Daniel Gauthier, Jae Seong No, Blake Disiere, Laura Barajas, Misty Weiner, Xinjie Luo, Emilie Stuebe, Matt Goldman, Stephen Colon, Brian Chang, Victor Muratalla Morales, Chezare Torres, Rory Crook, Selisa Wright, Natasha Zaretsky, Noah Hersom, Devin Lynch, Brent Sievers, Kevin Pormir, Ryan Kreisberg, Tyler Sherer, Julia Dunn, Aaron Khansefid, Ryan McKeown, Karen Reynaga, James Everglade, Jonathan Englehart, Benjamin Romero, Amanda Wood, Diana Vega, Courtney Hanson, Ryan Johnson, Kristy Fenning, Joel Frattini, Megan Gaebler, Joseph De Jonge, Derek Marx, Lauren Carlton, Cynthia Flores, Francesca Campos, David Love, Peter Young, Shae Rafferty, Thomas Peres, Mo Zhang, Congher Schomburg, Andrew Trevino, Nicole Gedert, Stephanie Seibel, Laura Bronson, Casey Kono, Cameron Brown, Benjamin Algeo, Omar Villa, Edward Dobyns, Matthew Lusher, Andy Ambrose, Taryn McPherson, Wyatt Thurston, Katrina Davis, Joshua Liu, Quincy Venter, Alyssa Picard, Jesse Hertz, Britanny Castillo, Samuel Velie, Mridul Batra, Michael Hallock, James Whalen, Alexander Nee, Miles Hearn, Matt Sportini, Alexander Cerjan, Justas Lauzadis, Danielle Littman, Winn Miller, Ryan Strauss, Craig Sotebeer, Brett Bell, Lauren Cason, Cody Childers, Anthony Del Cid, Chris Jacobson, Thomas Wicker, Emily Martin, Richard Smith, Max Wolff, Richard Mojica, Charles Pickard, Colby Richards, Joshua Cottrell-Schloemer, Joanne Lee-Yuen, Jillian Jackson, Samuel Dunscombe, Ian Epps, Jasmine Pawlicki, Megan Bergeron, Jared Paulo, Jacob Rakosi, Jeff Stark, Gary Ngo, Joseph Gradias, Chris Driscoll, Richard Stofle, Laura Bates, Allen Chung, Sam Wolfe, Ishita Saxena, Janet Lu, Daniel Schwiebert, Tyler Meacham, Marina Paske, Matei Bivolaru, Matthew Slovin, Mariah Erlick, Nina Chidichimo, Mark Barbosa, Justin Rezende, David Dulle, Roy Thompson, Chelsea Clark, Carissa Sanchez, Renata Costa, Andrew Colucci, Joshua Rhoades, Gordon Yu, Alyssa Young, Alexander Yaldo, Daniel Balsam, Joseph Goodknight, James Boggie, Philip Wilkerson, Dillon Orr, Julie Rainey, Marina Handwerk, Dae Han Kim, Angela Wayne, Joseph McManus, Cory Barclay, Jennifer Lee-Yuen, Lauren Saguilig, Arjang Navab, Nathan Lawson, Brandon Kassimir, Pierre Cuglievan, Matthew Shaffer, Christine Rowland, Jordan Paddock, John Alexander, Michael Choi, Desiree Valadez, Steven Zwick, Evan Beckner, Sawyer Hardie, Ref Chowdhury, Kevin Tan, Zachary Mullings, Kurt Ruegg, Joel Goldschlag and Carli Kitto
Defendant: Google, Inc. and Google, LLC
Case Number: 5:2016cv00473
Filed: January 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H Koh
Referring Judge: Howard R Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Dismissing With Prejudice. Signed by Hon. Lucy H. Koh on 10/18/16. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016) Modified on 10/18/2016. Modified docket text to reflect order signed by Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (ofr, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2016 Filing 138 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of 702 Plaintiffs Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) by Ryan Corley (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
October 3, 2016 Filing 137 NOTICE by Ryan Corley of Settlement of Claims of 702 Plaintiffs (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
September 19, 2016 Filing 136 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Shawn Kim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) filed by Shawn Kim. (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Case Management Order and Order by Judge Lucy Koh Denying as Moot (122) Motion to Dismiss in Corley v. Google, Inc., 5:16-CV-00473-LHK; Denying as Moot (33) Motion to Dismiss in Amaral v. Google, Inc., 5:16-CV-02553-LHK. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Order by Judge Lucy Koh Granting (96) Motion to Sever in Corley v. Google, Inc. , 5:16-CV-00473-LHK; Granting (20) Motion to Sever in Amaral v. Google, Inc. , 5:16-CV-02553-LHK. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 18, 2016 Filing 133 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/18/2016 from 2:18-2:36 PM. A forthcoming Case Management Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. A further Case Management Conference is set for 10/27/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. 7-days prior to the next CMC date, the parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement, pursuant to Civil Local Rules 16-10(d). Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Courtroom Deputy: Stacy Sakamoto. Representing Plaintiffs: Attorney Ray Edwin Gallo. Representing Defendant: Attorney Whitty Somvichian. (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/18/2016)
August 17, 2016 Filing 132 **CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THURSDAY'S MOTION HEARINGS (CMCS REMAINS AS SET)** Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds the pending Motions to Sever (ECF No. 96 in Corley and ECF No. 20 in Amaral) suitable for decision without oral argument and hereby VACATES the hearings set for Thursday, August 18, 2016 at 1:30PM. The August 18, 2016 Case Management Conferences REMAINS AS PREVIOUSLY SET. (This is a text-only notice; there is no document associated with this entry.) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
August 16, 2016 Filing 131 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Updated Joint Case Management Statement filed by Google, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Order to File Updated Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 08/12/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
August 11, 2016 Filing 129 Joint Response Pursuant to the Court's August 8, 2016 Request for Information re #126 Order by Ryan Corley. (Stramiello, Warren) (Filed on 8/11/2016) Modified text to match title on 8/12/2016 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2016 Filing 128 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 10, 2016 Filing 127 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Matt Sportini pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) filed by Matt Sportini. (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Order Regarding Status of Individual Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 08/08/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Order by Judge Lucy Koh Granting #124 Stipulation. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 27, 2016 Filing 124 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Briefing Schedule re Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Civil L.R. 6-1, 6-2) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Parties' Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Modify Briefing Schedule re Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Civil L.R. 6-1, 6-2))(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 27, 2016 Filing 123 REPLY (re #96 MOTION to Sever Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen L. Burhans in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Sever and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Karen L. Burhans in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Sever and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 20, 2016 Filing 122 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Google, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 8/3/2016. Replies due by 8/10/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong ISO Def. Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plfs' 1st Am. Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong ISO Def. Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plfs' 1st Am. Complaint, #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 6, 2016 Filing 121 RESPONSE (re #96 MOTION to Sever Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Google's Motion to Sever and Dismiss filed byRyan Corley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of D.Valerian ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Google's Motion to Sever and Dismiss)(Stramiello, Warren) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
July 1, 2016 Filing 120 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedures 41(a) by Myles Scolnick (Stramiello, Warren) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 27, 2016 Filing 119 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) by Patrick Rooney (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 24, 2016 Filing 118 RESPONSE (re #96 MOTION to Sever Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byPublic Citizen, Inc.. (Chavez, Mark) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #114 Administrative Motion For Leave to File Amicus Curiae Memorandum. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/22/16. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying #90 Defendant's motion for protective order and granting in part #89 Plaintiffs' motion for protective order. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 21, 2016 Filing 114 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Public Citizen hereby moves the Court, pursuant to Local Rule 7-11, for leave to file a memorandum as amicus curiae to assist the Court in deciding Defendant's Motion to Sever and Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims. filed by Public Citizen, Inc.. Responses due by 6/27/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Shelby Leighton in Support of Public Citizen's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Public Citizen's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Memorandum)(Chavez, Mark) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #111 Stipulation to Extend Date to Respond to FAC. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #110 Stipulation for A Short Extension of the Briefing Schedule. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 20, 2016 Filing 111 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation To Extend Date To Respond to First Amended Complaint and [Proposed] Order filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kyle C. Wong ISO Stip. to Extend Date to Respond to First Amended Complaint and [Proposed] Order)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 20, 2016 Filing 110 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for a Short Extension of the Briefing Schedule on Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Sever (Civil L.R. 6-1, 6-2) filed by Ryan Corley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dominic Valerian in support of Parties' Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for a Short Extension of the Briefing Schedule on Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Sever (Civil L.R. 6-1, 6-2))(Valerian, Dominic) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying #107 Stipulation for Temporary Stay. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 20, 2016 Filing 108 Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of #107 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings Temporarily (CIVIL L.R. 6-1, 6-2) filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Related document(s) #107 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 20, 2016 Filing 107 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings Temporarily (CIVIL L.R. 6-1, 6-2) filed by Google, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 15, 2016 Filing 106 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Procedure 41(a) by Rebecca Hassinger (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
May 31, 2016 Filing 105 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this Notice, the 8/4/2016 further CMC is HEREBY CONTINUED to 8/18/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. This new date/time for the CMC coincides with the hearing on the pending Motion to Sever, ECF No. #96 . 7 days before the next CMC, the Parties must jointly file an updated Case Management Conference Statement, per Civil L.R. 16-10(d). (This is a text-only notice; there is no document associated with this entry.) (smsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 23, 2016 Filing 104 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) by Acshi Haggenmiller (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 23, 2016 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/28/2016 before Hon. Lucy H. Koh by Ryan Corley, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 5/23/2016) (PREVIOUSLY TRANSCRIBED BY JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 5/23/2016 (sms, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2016 Filing 102 Magistrate Judge Howard R Lloyd has been assigned as referral judge to case re #100 Order Granting Request for Recusal. Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal no longer assigned to case as referral judge. Please Note this is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 23, 2016 Filing 101 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MAY 24, 2016 MOTION HEARING BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAUL S. GREWAL (In Re: ECF Nos. #89 and #90 ): 5/24/2016 10:00 AM Motion Hearing before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal is hereby vacated pursuant to ECF No. #100 . Parties will be informed by separate notice of the referral judge to whom this case is reassigned. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 23, 2016, re #95 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part #98 Stipulation on Motions. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 19, 2016 Filing 98 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Sever (Civil L.R. 6-1(a)); Stipulated Request to Set the Hearing Date (Civil L.R. 6-2) filed by Google, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
May 18, 2016 Filing 97 Request for Judicial Notice re #96 MOTION to Sever Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Google Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Its Motion to Sever and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims)(Related document(s) #96 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 18, 2016 Filing 96 MOTION to Sever Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Google, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 6/1/2016. Replies due by 6/8/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Kyle C. Wong, #5 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 18, 2016 Filing 95 Letter from Ray Gallo to Magistrate Judge Grewal re Impartiality. (Stramiello, Warren) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 17, 2016 Filing 94 RESPONSE (re #90 MOTION for Protective Order Google Inc.'s Brief in Support of Adoption of Its Proposed Protective Order ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Adopt Defendant's Proposed Protective Order filed byRyan Corley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Warren Stramiello in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Adoption of Defendant's Proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to the Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to the Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to the Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to the Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to the Declaration)(Stramiello, Warren) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 17, 2016 Filing 93 RESPONSE (re #89 MOTION for Protective Order --Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order ) Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Adopt the Northern District of California's Model Protective Order filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen L. Burhans in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Adopt the Northern District of California's Model Protective Order)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 16, 2016 Filing 92 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING, setting hearing as to #89 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Protective Order and #90 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order: Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 91 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Google Inc. to Respond to First Amended Complaint (Civil L.R. 6-1(a)) filed by Google, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 90 MOTION for Protective Order Google Inc.'s Brief in Support of Adoption of Its Proposed Protective Order filed by Google, Inc.. Responses due by 5/17/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen L. Burhans in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Support of Adoption of Its Proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Karen L. Burhans in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Support of Adoption of Its Proposed Protective Order, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Karen L. Burhans in Support of Google Inc.'s Brief in Support of Adoption of Its Proposed Protective Order, #4 Proposed Order Google Inc.'s Proposed Protective Order)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 89 MOTION for Protective Order --Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order filed by Kenneth Abeyratne, Lucas Acosta, Liban Aden, Moshe Admon, Javier Aguirre, Nadia Aissi, Aisana Aitzhanova, Charlee Akina, Callum Aldred, John Alexander, Benjamin Algeo, Bryce Allen, Caroline Alrman, Adam Alsabery, Vienna Alvarez, William Alverson, Andy Ambrose, Luke Anderson, Sean Antonacci, Brandon Arachikavitz, Scott Arellano, Omeed Atefi, Talia Avisar, Martha Avtandilian, Noah Baily, Jared Baker, Matt Baker, Daniel Balsam, Jason Balsamo, Laura Barajas, Kenia Barba, Mark Barbosa, Cory Barclay, Christopher Barnard, Halley Barnett, David Baroody, Forrest Bashaw, Laura Bates, Melissa Bates, Mridul Batra, Lorna Battista, John Becker, Evan Beckner, Brett Bell, Ayla Benavides, Edward Benitez, Frank Benitez, Megan Bergeron, Patrick Bergerson, Rim Berhane, Robert Berry, Rhiannon Bezore, Matei Bivolaru, James Boggie, Eleanor Bohn, Myken Bomberger, Jesse Bonelli, Mariel Booth, Michaella Borges, Max Brawer, Patricio Brito, Daniel Brog, Grant Bronsdon, Laura Bronson, Jake Broser, Peter Broski, Barbara Brown, Cameron Brown, Noranda Brown, Mark Brunton, Jonica Buck, John Buell, Wrenn Bunker-Koesters, Ryan Burke, Adam Buxbaum, Janel Calinog, Francesca Campos, Katherine Cannon, Veronica Cano Chavez, Lauren Carlton, Christian Carrillo, Lauren Cason, Rachel Castiglione, Britanny Castillo, Karen Catlow, Samuel Cavazos, Alexander Cerjan, Meagan Chamberlain, Brett Chamberlin, Kevin Chaney, Brian Chang, Thomas Chavez, Jonathan Chen, Randy Cherland, Ritish Chhabra, Daniel Chiang, Nina Chidichimo, Cody Childers, Sandra Childress, James Chiocchio, Michael Choi, Ref Chowdhury, Allen Chung, Chelsea Clark, Jordan Colclasure, Lisette Cole, Andrew Collins, Stephen Colon, Andrew Colucci, Ethan Compton, Emily Connelly, Julianne Conrad, Logan Cooper, Tiffany Cooper, Heather Copps, Harrison Corbett, Jeremy Cordeiro, Ryan Corley, Nicholas Corpuz, Eudald Correig Fraga, Erica Cortez, Renata Costa, Joshua Cottrell-Schloemer, Layton Cox, Marlee Craker, Dax Crocker, Rory Crook, Pierre Cuglievan, Stephen D'Addio, Mark Dalgaard, Bret Dalldorf, Joseph Danehower, Zachari Daquioag, Deborah Davis, Eli Davis, Katrina Davis, Hillary Dawsey, Joseph De Jonge, Paul De La Torre, Brenda De Leon, Juliet Deamicis, Tyler Deangelis, Michael Deck, Anthony Del Cid, Danielle Delbert, Maxwell Denny, Lillian DiCarlo, Daniel Diaz, Jeremy Diehl, Amber Diluzio, Brian Dinh, Vincent Dirienzo, Blake Disiere, Alexander Dobranic, Edward Dobyns, William Dormann, Aaron Doucett, Phillip Dove, Octav Dragoi, Sean Draper, Chris Driscoll, Aliah Drow, Krista Drummond, Kenneth Duckworth, David Dulle, Julia Dunn, Samuel Dunscombe, John Durbin, Michael Easterby, Andrew Ecord, Bianca Edwards, Daniel Elkus, Zina Ellis, Aunna Elrod, Colton Emel, Justin Emery, Chase Engelhardt, Jonathan Englehart, Ian Epps, Michelle Erford, Mariah Erlick, Julie Etheridge, Rachel Ett, Carl Evans, James Everglade, Bryan Eyers, Holden Faber, Kelsey Fahey, Roger Fairley, Sean Fanning, Robert Farrar, Kelsey Farrell, Anton Fedorov, Julia Feldman, James Feng, Kristy Fenning, Daniel Fernandez, Tova Ferstenberg, Jose Figueroa Delgado, Zachary Finch, Matthew Fisherkeller, Michael Flagg, Brandon Flannery, Cynthia Flores, Kimberly Flores, Skylar Florian, Ryan Flynn, Corinne Foley, John Forbes, Alexandria Foster, Shannon Fouts, David Frailey, Samuel Frank, Joel Frattini, Mark Fredrickson, Mark Freeman, Matthew Freifeld, Charles Fukai, Thaine Fuller, Megan Gaebler, Brian Gamez, Mary Garcia, Abigail Gardner, Kenneth Garges, Daniel Gauthier, Nicole Gedert, Benjamin Geilich, Paula Gelvez-Petrone, Michael Geyer, Rajan Gill, James Gillooley, Jessica Giusti, Jessica Golden, Alex Goldklang, Matt Goldman, Joel Goldschlag, Leonardo Gonzalez, Joseph Goodknight, Joseph Gradias, Shari Gray, Andrew Grazioli, Joseph Greenbaum, Rachel Greenbaum, Robert Griego III, Peter Griffis, Catherine Grizzell, Derek Grosshart, Michael Guillory, Seth Guldin, Bishal Gupta, Samir Gupta, Peter Gustafson, Carmen Gutierrez, Jerrelle Guy, Acshi Haggenmiller, Jerome Hale, Michael Hall, Nicholas Hall, Michael Hallock, Mark Hamilton, Marina Handwerk, Christine Hanna, Courtney Hanson, Sawyer Hardie, Rebecca Hassinger, Quinn Hatoff, Eric Haviland, Miles Hearn, Lauren Hebert, Taylor Heisley-Cook, Richard Heitmeyer, Devon Henry, Nelson Hernandez, Austin Herry, Noah Hersom, Jesse Hertz, Elin Hervall, Mitchell Heschke, Gordon Hiland, Cory Hill, Brandon Hodges, Hailey Hollers, Mark Hollwedel, Demarie Holmes, Nia Holston, Tyler Howell, Ellen Howes, Kai Hoyt, Nicholas Hoyt, Sally Hu, Kensai Hughes, Kayla Hutchings, Torri Igou, Timothy Irvine, Jillian Jackson, Chris Jacobson, Murtaza Jafferji, Yesenia Jameson, Gustavo Jauregui, Maria Jennings, Jasmeet Jernaill, Thomas Jobst, Jr., Nina Johal, Joseph Johns, Karl Johnson, Rosa Johnson, Ryan Johnson, Aaron Jones, Crystal Joseph, Evan Kahn, Michael Kaspark, Brandon Kassimir, Archavanich Kawmongkolsi, Joseph Kayaleh, Jesse Kelly, Aaron Kenny, Siri Kirin Khalsa, Aaron Khansefid, B. Kim, Dae Han Kim, Shawn Kim, Andrew King, Ryan King, Royce Kirk, Carli Kitto, Jessica Klix, Janice Knight, Justin Kohlberg, Casey Kono, Alec Konstantin, Maksim Korolev, Tarun Koshy, Kyle Kovacs, Ryan Kreisberg, Alexandra Kurtz, Brian Kurtz, Rhonda La Grande, Rosemary La Grua, Antonio Lamv, Justas Lauzadis, Nathan Lawson, Evan Layman, Cassandra Leasure, Daniel Lecours, Bryan Leddy, Jennifer Lee-Yuen, Joanne Lee-Yuen, Josh Lehga, Adam Leotta, Benjamin Lesea-Pringle, Martha Letchinger, Shannon Levis, Daniel Lewis, Joseph Lewis, Erica Leyva Arenas, Helen Li, Michael Li, Chelsea Liebowitz, Anthony Lim, Danielle Littman, David Liu, Joshua Liu, Athena Lo, Sergey Lobatch, Daniel Lopez, David Love, Signe Loving, Janet Lu, Eric Lujan, Elias Luna, Xinjie Luo, Matthew Lusher, Devin Lynch, Sean Lyness, Casimir Lyszczarczyk, Benjamin Mabie, Steven Mach, Carleigh Madden, Colin Madrid, William Major, Hin Mak, Mihailo Malowany, Henry Manes, Emily Martin, Sean Martin, Paul Martino, Megan Martucci, Derek Marx, Alexander Matzat, Thomas McCann, Amanda McClintock, Charles McDonald, Asher McGuffin, Tracelyn McGuire, Kevin McKeown, Ryan McKeown, Joseph McManus, Jean-Luc McMurtry, Taryn McPherson, Jason McQuade, Tyler Meacham, William Mebane, Shannon Mehaffey, Alyssa Mehl, Ricardo Melgoza, Kyle Mendenhall, Ignacio Mendez-Nunez, Alvaro Mendizabal, Aaron Metviner, Todd Michael, Ericka Michal, Amy Miller, Joseph Miller, Winn Miller, Ryan Millman, Amanda Mitchell, Nikki Modiri, Keyhan Moini, Richard Mojica, Nicholas Mokover, Matthew Molzahn, Aleesa Monaco, Edgar Mondragon, Elizabeth Mooney, Cosme Morga, Josue Morga, Stephen Morrison, Kira Moser, Gregory Mozdyniewicz, Matthew Mueller, Zachary Mullings, Karthik Munugala, Victor Muratalla Morales, Travis Murphy, Arjang Navab, Alexander Nee, Spencer Neiman, Gary Ngo, Andrew Nguyen, Dustin Niblett, Nicole Niebrzydowski, Sarah Nikdel, Jae Seong No, Conor O'Brien, David O'Connell, Justin O'Hare, Corey O'Neill, Christian Ogren, Tim Okkema, Lauren Olney, Grant Olscamp, Christine Ondris, Dillon Orr, Daniel Osorio, Zachary Ouellette, Jordan Paddock, Jessica Paek, Kevin Park, Marina Paske, Sara Paull, Jared Paulo, Jasmine Pawlicki, Lindsay Payne, Thomas Peres, Anthony Perrotta, Dennis Peterson, Ethan Pezzolo, Kevin Pham, Matthew Phillips, Alyssa Picard, Kyle Picha, Charles Pickard, Nathanael Pickslay, Irene Pinon, Kevin Pormir, Edgar Portillo, Jesse Posehn, Brian Pybas, Stephen Racca, Patricia Radis, Shae Rafferty, Arielle Rahmanan, Laurel Rain, Julie Rainey, Jacob Rakosi, Jay Ram, Steve Ramirez, Norma Ramos, Joseph Rapier, Dmitriy Rapoport, Debra Ray, Melanie Redd, Jay Reddy, Christian Reed, Darlene Reilley, Hannah Remis, Saila Reyes, Karen Reynaga, Justin Rezende, Joshua Rhoades, Colby Richards, Paul Richter, Voltario Rico, Kellie Riggs, Eric Riley, Annelise Ringelman, Ashley Rits, Sarah Rittenour, Joseph Rivera, Michael Rivera, Derek Robbins, Kathryn Robison, Donald Rodriguez, Steven Rodriguez, John Rogers, Ryan Romain, Benjamin Romero, Patrick Rooney, Isaac Root, Sean Roper, Dara Rosenkrantz, Shoshana Rosenthal, Sean Ross, Benjamin Rowan, Christine Rowland, Michael Roy, Evgenia Royter, Patrick Rubio, Denise Rueda, Kurt Ruegg, David Ruelas, Christopher Rutledge, Danielle Ryder, Ardena Saarinen, Robert Saeman, Lauren Saguilig, Wilfred Salas Jr., Nicholas Samokyszyn, Matthew Sample, Jason Sanbei, Carissa Sanchez, Remy Sarhan, Lina Sarusal, Ishita Saxena, Kevin Saxman, Emily Schapka, Jake Scheps, Christine Schmitt, Thomas Schmitt, Congher Schomburg, Jack Schow, Thomas Schulte, Geoff Schuyler, Daniel Schwiebert, Myles Scolnick, Tyler Searls, Stephanie Seibel, Luke Sellers, Matthew Shaffer, Samir Shah, Tyler Sherer, David Sherman, Monica Sherwood, Kevin Shih, Reed Showalter, Daniel Shubat, Yevgeniy Shuster, Brent Sievers, Erica Siu, David Skarbowski, Brian Skillings, Matthew Slovin, Joseph Smeeding, Andrew Smith, Brittany Smith, Harrison Smith, Jordan Smith, Morgan Smith, Richard Smith, Sophia Smith, Justin Sola, Michael Solotke, Lewis Solow-Collins, Miles Sorel, Craig Sotebeer, Matt Sportini, Sean Stalhandske, Zachary Stamplis, Jeff Stark, Tomasz Stawicki, Holly Stehlin, Jeffrey Stephens, Alexadner Stoffel, Richard Stofle, Joshua Storms, Rory Strahan-Mauk, Ryan Strauss, Gregory Stuck, Emilie Stuebe, Tala Sullivan, Sebastian Swae-Shampine, Ryan Swearingen, Cristina Swift, Deborah Tackett, Rex Tai, Vanessa Tait, Samuel Tall, Kristian Talley, Kevin Tan, Tammy Tan, Ronald Tardiff, Meighan Taylor, Brian Teed, Etienne Thach, Robert Thomas, Kayla Thompson, Roy Thompson, Wyatt Thurston, Robert Thyberg, Steven Timlin, Joanna Titus, Chezare Torres, Samuel Torres, Maria Torruella Suarez, Katrina Tosh, Cody Trevillian, Andrew Trevino, Kailey-Alyssa Tucker, Melody Tuttle, Symeon Tzvetkov, Kimberly Vadelnieks, Desiree Valadez, Karina Valencia, Anthony Valente, Jonathan Van Ness, Amber Vandever (Schlecht), Tamara Varga, Polly Varize, Zachary Vary, Diana Vega, Kriya Issa Velasco, Samuel Velie, Quincy Venter, Maia Ventura, Pedro Venzor, Sandeep Verma, Omar Villa, Nikolay Vinogradov-Nurenberg, James Volz, June Vutrano, Maya Wagoner, Robert Wainblat, Raymond Wang, Bradford Ward, Jessie Watson, Angela Wayne, Amanda We
May 13, 2016 Filing 88 Proposed Order Plaintiffs Proposed Protective Order by Kenneth Abeyratne, Lucas Acosta, Liban Aden, Moshe Admon, Javier Aguirre, Nadia Aissi, Aisana Aitzhanova, Charlee Akina, Callum Aldred, John Alexander, Benjamin Algeo, Bryce Allen, Caroline Alrman, Adam Alsabery, Vienna Alvarez, William Alverson, Andy Ambrose, Luke Anderson, Sean Antonacci, Brandon Arachikavitz, Scott Arellano, Omeed Atefi, Talia Avisar, Martha Avtandilian, Noah Baily, Jared Baker, Matt Baker, Daniel Balsam, Jason Balsamo, Laura Barajas, Kenia Barba, Mark Barbosa, Cory Barclay, Christopher Barnard, Halley Barnett, David Baroody, Forrest Bashaw, Laura Bates, Melissa Bates, Mridul Batra, Lorna Battista, John Becker, Evan Beckner, Brett Bell, Ayla Benavides, Edward Benitez, Frank Benitez, Megan Bergeron, Patrick Bergerson, Rim Berhane, Robert Berry, Rhiannon Bezore, Matei Bivolaru, James Boggie, Eleanor Bohn, Myken Bomberger, Jesse Bonelli, Mariel Booth, Michaella Borges, Max Brawer, Patricio Brito, Daniel Brog, Grant Bronsdon, Laura Bronson, Jake Broser, Peter Broski, Barbara Brown, Cameron Brown, Noranda Brown, Mark Brunton, Jonica Buck, John Buell, Wrenn Bunker-Koesters, Ryan Burke, Adam Buxbaum, Janel Calinog, Francesca Campos, Katherine Cannon, Veronica Cano Chavez, Lauren Carlton, Christian Carrillo, Lauren Cason, Rachel Castiglione, Britanny Castillo, Karen Catlow, Samuel Cavazos, Alexander Cerjan, Meagan Chamberlain, Brett Chamberlin, Kevin Chaney, Brian Chang, Thomas Chavez, Jonathan Chen, Randy Cherland, Ritish Chhabra, Daniel Chiang, Nina Chidichimo, Cody Childers, Sandra Childress, James Chiocchio, Michael Choi, Ref Chowdhury, Allen Chung, Chelsea Clark, Jordan Colclasure, Lisette Cole, Andrew Collins, Stephen Colon, Andrew Colucci, Ethan Compton, Emily Connelly, Julianne Conrad, Logan Cooper, Tiffany Cooper, Heather Copps, Harrison Corbett, Jeremy Cordeiro, Ryan Corley, Nicholas Corpuz, Eudald Correig Fraga, Erica Cortez, Renata Costa, Joshua Cottrell-Schloemer, Layton Cox, Marlee Craker, Dax Crocker, Rory Crook, Pierre Cuglievan, Stephen D'Addio, Mark Dalgaard, Bret Dalldorf, Joseph Danehower, Zachari Daquioag, Deborah Davis, Eli Davis, Katrina Davis, Hillary Dawsey, Joseph De Jonge, Paul De La Torre, Brenda De Leon, Juliet Deamicis, Tyler Deangelis, Michael Deck, Anthony Del Cid, Danielle Delbert, Maxwell Denny, Lillian DiCarlo, Daniel Diaz, Jeremy Diehl, Amber Diluzio, Brian Dinh, Vincent Dirienzo, Blake Disiere, Alexander Dobranic, Edward Dobyns, William Dormann, Aaron Doucett, Phillip Dove, Octav Dragoi, Sean Draper, Chris Driscoll, Aliah Drow, Krista Drummond, Kenneth Duckworth, David Dulle, Julia Dunn, Samuel Dunscombe, John Durbin, Michael Easterby, Andrew Ecord, Bianca Edwards, Daniel Elkus, Zina Ellis, Aunna Elrod, Colton Emel, Justin Emery, Chase Engelhardt, Jonathan Englehart, Ian Epps, Michelle Erford, Mariah Erlick, Julie Etheridge, Rachel Ett, Carl Evans, James Everglade, Bryan Eyers, Holden Faber, Kelsey Fahey, Roger Fairley, Sean Fanning, Robert Farrar, Kelsey Farrell, Anton Fedorov, Julia Feldman, James Feng, Kristy Fenning, Daniel Fernandez, Tova Ferstenberg, Jose Figueroa Delgado, Zachary Finch, Matthew Fisherkeller, Michael Flagg, Brandon Flannery, Cynthia Flores, Kimberly Flores, Skylar Florian, Ryan Flynn, Corinne Foley, John Forbes, Alexandria Foster, Shannon Fouts, David Frailey, Samuel Frank, Joel Frattini, Mark Fredrickson, Mark Freeman, Matthew Freifeld, Charles Fukai, Thaine Fuller, Megan Gaebler, Brian Gamez, Mary Garcia, Abigail Gardner, Kenneth Garges, Daniel Gauthier, Nicole Gedert, Benjamin Geilich, Paula Gelvez-Petrone, Michael Geyer, Rajan Gill, James Gillooley, Jessica Giusti, Jessica Golden, Alex Goldklang, Matt Goldman, Joel Goldschlag, Leonardo Gonzalez, Joseph Goodknight, Joseph Gradias, Shari Gray, Andrew Grazioli, Joseph Greenbaum, Rachel Greenbaum, Robert Griego III, Peter Griffis, Catherine Grizzell, Derek Grosshart, Michael Guillory, Seth Guldin, Bishal Gupta, Samir Gupta, Peter Gustafson, Carmen Gutierrez, Jerrelle Guy, Acshi Haggenmiller, Jerome Hale, Michael Hall, Nicholas Hall, Michael Hallock, Mark Hamilton, Marina Handwerk, Christine Hanna, Courtney Hanson, Sawyer Hardie, Rebecca Hassinger, Quinn Hatoff, Eric Haviland, Miles Hearn, Lauren Hebert, Taylor Heisley-Cook, Richard Heitmeyer, Devon Henry, Nelson Hernandez, Austin Herry, Noah Hersom, Jesse Hertz, Elin Hervall, Mitchell Heschke, Gordon Hiland, Cory Hill, Brandon Hodges, Hailey Hollers, Mark Hollwedel, Demarie Holmes, Nia Holston, Tyler Howell, Ellen Howes, Kai Hoyt, Nicholas Hoyt, Sally Hu, Kensai Hughes, Kayla Hutchings, Torri Igou, Timothy Irvine, Jillian Jackson, Chris Jacobson, Murtaza Jafferji, Yesenia Jameson, Gustavo Jauregui, Maria Jennings, Jasmeet Jernaill, Thomas Jobst, Jr., Nina Johal, Joseph Johns, Karl Johnson, Rosa Johnson, Ryan Johnson, Aaron Jones, Crystal Joseph, Evan Kahn, Michael Kaspark, Brandon Kassimir, Archavanich Kawmongkolsi, Joseph Kayaleh, Jesse Kelly, Aaron Kenny, Siri Kirin Khalsa, Aaron Khansefid, B. Kim, Dae Han Kim, Shawn Kim, Andrew King, Ryan King, Royce Kirk, Carli Kitto, Jessica Klix, Janice Knight, Justin Kohlberg, Casey Kono, Alec Konstantin, Maksim Korolev, Tarun Koshy, Kyle Kovacs, Ryan Kreisberg, Alexandra Kurtz, Brian Kurtz, Rhonda La Grande, Rosemary La Grua, Antonio Lamv, Justas Lauzadis, Nathan Lawson, Evan Layman, Cassandra Leasure, Daniel Lecours, Bryan Leddy, Jennifer Lee-Yuen, Joanne Lee-Yuen, Josh Lehga, Adam Leotta, Benjamin Lesea-Pringle, Martha Letchinger, Shannon Levis, Daniel Lewis, Joseph Lewis, Erica Leyva Arenas, Helen Li, Michael Li, Chelsea Liebowitz, Anthony Lim, Danielle Littman, David Liu, Joshua Liu, Athena Lo, Sergey Lobatch, Daniel Lopez, David Love, Signe Loving, Janet Lu, Eric Lujan, Elias Luna, Xinjie Luo, Matthew Lusher, Devin Lynch, Sean Lyness, Casimir Lyszczarczyk, Benjamin Mabie, Steven Mach, Carleigh Madden, Colin Madrid, William Major, Hin Mak, Mihailo Malowany, Henry Manes, Emily Martin, Sean Martin, Paul Martino, Megan Martucci, Derek Marx, Alexander Matzat, Thomas McCann, Amanda McClintock, Charles McDonald, Asher McGuffin, Tracelyn McGuire, Kevin McKeown, Ryan McKeown, Joseph McManus, Jean-Luc McMurtry, Taryn McPherson, Jason McQuade, Tyler Meacham, William Mebane, Shannon Mehaffey, Alyssa Mehl, Ricardo Melgoza, Kyle Mendenhall, Ignacio Mendez-Nunez, Alvaro Mendizabal, Aaron Metviner, Todd Michael, Ericka Michal, Amy Miller, Joseph Miller, Winn Miller, Ryan Millman, Amanda Mitchell, Nikki Modiri, Keyhan Moini, Richard Mojica, Nicholas Mokover, Matthew Molzahn, Aleesa Monaco, Edgar Mondragon, Elizabeth Mooney, Cosme Morga, Josue Morga, Stephen Morrison, Kira Moser, Gregory Mozdyniewicz, Matthew Mueller, Zachary Mullings, Karthik Munugala, Victor Muratalla Morales, Travis Murphy, Arjang Navab, Alexander Nee, Spencer Neiman, Gary Ngo, Andrew Nguyen, Dustin Niblett, Nicole Niebrzydowski, Sarah Nikdel, Jae Seong No, Conor O'Brien, David O'Connell, Justin O'Hare, Corey O'Neill, Christian Ogren, Tim Okkema, Lauren Olney, Grant Olscamp, Christine Ondris, Dillon Orr, Daniel Osorio, Zachary Ouellette, Jordan Paddock, Jessica Paek, Kevin Park, Marina Paske, Sara Paull, Jared Paulo, Jasmine Pawlicki, Lindsay Payne, Thomas Peres, Anthony Perrotta, Dennis Peterson, Ethan Pezzolo, Kevin Pham, Matthew Phillips, Alyssa Picard, Kyle Picha, Charles Pickard, Nathanael Pickslay, Irene Pinon, Kevin Pormir, Edgar Portillo, Jesse Posehn, Brian Pybas, Stephen Racca, Patricia Radis, Shae Rafferty, Arielle Rahmanan, Laurel Rain, Julie Rainey, Jacob Rakosi, Jay Ram, Steve Ramirez, Norma Ramos, Joseph Rapier, Dmitriy Rapoport, Debra Ray, Melanie Redd, Jay Reddy, Christian Reed, Darlene Reilley, Hannah Remis, Saila Reyes, Karen Reynaga, Justin Rezende, Joshua Rhoades, Colby Richards, Paul Richter, Voltario Rico, Kellie Riggs, Eric Riley, Annelise Ringelman, Ashley Rits, Sarah Rittenour, Joseph Rivera, Michael Rivera, Derek Robbins, Kathryn Robison, Donald Rodriguez, Steven Rodriguez, John Rogers, Ryan Romain, Benjamin Romero, Patrick Rooney, Isaac Root, Sean Roper, Dara Rosenkrantz, Shoshana Rosenthal, Sean Ross, Benjamin Rowan, Christine Rowland, Michael Roy, Evgenia Royter, Patrick Rubio, Denise Rueda, Kurt Ruegg, David Ruelas, Christopher Rutledge, Danielle Ryder, Ardena Saarinen, Robert Saeman, Lauren Saguilig, Wilfred Salas Jr., Nicholas Samokyszyn, Matthew Sample, Jason Sanbei, Carissa Sanchez, Remy Sarhan, Lina Sarusal, Ishita Saxena, Kevin Saxman, Emily Schapka, Jake Scheps, Christine Schmitt, Thomas Schmitt, Congher Schomburg, Jack Schow, Thomas Schulte, Geoff Schuyler, Daniel Schwiebert, Myles Scolnick, Tyler Searls, Stephanie Seibel, Luke Sellers, Matthew Shaffer, Samir Shah, Tyler Sherer, David Sherman, Monica Sherwood, Kevin Shih, Reed Showalter, Daniel Shubat, Yevgeniy Shuster, Brent Sievers, Erica Siu, David Skarbowski, Brian Skillings, Matthew Slovin, Joseph Smeeding, Andrew Smith, Brittany Smith, Harrison Smith, Jordan Smith, Morgan Smith, Richard Smith, Sophia Smith, Justin Sola, Michael Solotke, Lewis Solow-Collins, Miles Sorel, Craig Sotebeer, Matt Sportini, Sean Stalhandske, Zachary Stamplis, Jeff Stark, Tomasz Stawicki, Holly Stehlin, Jeffrey Stephens, Alexadner Stoffel, Richard Stofle, Joshua Storms, Rory Strahan-Mauk, Ryan Strauss, Gregory Stuck, Emilie Stuebe, Tala Sullivan, Sebastian Swae-Shampine, Ryan Swearingen, Cristina Swift, Deborah Tackett, Rex Tai, Vanessa Tait, Samuel Tall, Kristian Talley, Kevin Tan, Tammy Tan, Ronald Tardiff, Meighan Taylor, Brian Teed, Etienne Thach, Robert Thomas, Kayla Thompson, Roy Thompson, Wyatt Thurston, Robert Thyberg, Steven Timlin, Joanna Titus, Chezare Torres, Samuel Torres, Maria Torruella Suarez, Katrina Tosh, Cody Trevillian, Andrew Trevino, Kailey-Alyssa Tucker, Melody Tuttle, Symeon Tzvetkov, Kimberly Vadelnieks, Desiree Valadez, Karina Valencia, Anthony Valente, Jonathan Van Ness, Amber Vandever (Schlecht), Tamara Varga, Polly Varize, Zachary Vary, Diana Vega, Kriya Issa Velasco, Samuel Velie, Quincy Venter, Maia Ventura, Pedro Venzor, Sandeep Verma, Omar Villa, Nikolay Vinogradov-Nurenberg, James Volz, June Vutrano, Maya Wagoner, Robert Wainblat, Raymond Wang, Bradford Ward, Jessie Watson, Angela Wayne, Amanda Weber, Misty Weiner, Pat
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #86 Stipulation to Continue Deadline to File Stipulated Protective Order. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 6, 2016 Filing 86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Deadline to File Stipulated Protective Order (Civil L.R. 6-1, 6-2) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Deadline to File Stipulated Protective Order (Civil L.R. 6-1, 6-2))(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 85 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 28, 2016, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #81 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 5/26/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2016. (Related documents(s) #81 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Lynn Burhans (Burhans, Karen) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #82 Stipulation to Continue Deadline. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 4, 2016 Filing 82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Deadline to File Stipulated Protective Order (Civil L.R. 6-1, 6-2) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kyle C. Wong in Support of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Deadline to File Stipulated Protective Order (Civil L.R. 6-1, 6-2))(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
May 3, 2016 Filing 81 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/28/2016 before Hon. Lucy H. Koh by Google, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Smith, Amy) (Filed on 5/3/2016) (TRANSCRIBER ASSIGNED: JOAN COLUMBINI) (Modified on 5/4/2016 (sms, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2016 Filing 80 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/28/2016 before Hon. Lucy H. Koh for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (TRANSCRIBER ASSIGNED: JOAN COLUMBINI) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/28/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 28, 2016 Filing 78 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/28/2016 from 1:47-2:00 P.M. A forthcoming Case Management Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. A further Case Management Conference is set for 8/4/2016 at 1:30 P.M. in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. 7-days prior to the next CMC date, the parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement, pursuant to Civil Local Rules 16-10(d). CMC RECORDED BY FTR from 1:47-2:00 P.M. (in Courtroom 7). Courtroom Deputy: Stacy Sakamoto. Representing Plaintiffs: Attorneys Ray Gallo and Dominic Valerian. Representing Defendant: Attorneys Michael Graham Rhodes and Kyle Wong. (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/28/2016) Modified on 4/28/2016 (sms, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2016 Filing 77 RESPONSE to re #74 Brief Defendant Google Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Brief Regarding the Propriety of Mass Joinder by Google, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
April 26, 2016 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy McCowan Smith (Smith, Amy) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
April 25, 2016 Filing 75 Request for Judicial Notice re #74 Brief filed byRyan Corley. (Related document(s) #74 ) (Valerian, Dominic) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 25, 2016 Filing 74 Brief ISO Joinder filed byRyan Corley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Warren Stramiello ISO Joinder)(Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 22, 2016 Filing 73 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-20-16, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #72 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2016. (Related documents(s) #72 ) (las, ) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 22, 2016 Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04.20.2016 before Hon. Lucy H. Koh by Ryan Corley, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Stramiello, Warren) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 21, 2016 Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/20/2016 before Hon. Lucy H. Koh by Google, Inc., for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Wong, Kyle) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 21, 2016 Filing 70 ***FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD***TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/20/2016 before Hon. Lucy H. Koh by Ryan Corley, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Stramiello, Warren) (Filed on 4/21/2016) Modified on 4/22/2016 (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/22/2016 (sp, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/20/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
April 20, 2016 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/20/2016 from 3:02-4:15 P.M. A forthcoming Case Management Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the Conference. A further Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2016 at 1:30 P.M. in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Courtroom Deputy: Stacy Sakamoto. Representing Plaintiffs: Attorney Ray Edwin Gallo. Representing Defendant: Attorneys Michael Graham Rhodes and Kyle Christopher Wong. Also present: Snooki Puli, Divisional Office Supervisor for the Clerks Office in San Jose. (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) This is a text only Minute Entry (sms, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/20/2016)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #60 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
April 13, 2016 Filing 66 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #64 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Warren A. Stramiello. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 13, 2016 Filing 64 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Warren A. Stramiello ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10369348.) filed by Ryan Corley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Stramiello, Warren) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 13, 2016 Filing 63 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ryan Corley (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 6, 2016 Filing 62 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Ryan Corley, et al (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 6, 2016 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. re #59 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options, #60 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Google, Inc. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 6, 2016 Filing 60 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Google, Inc. filed by Google, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 6, 2016 Filing 59 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification of Google Inc. and Counsel (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh re #57 Stipulation on the Second Amended Complaint and Upcoming Case Management Conference.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 30, 2016 Filing 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Filing of Second Amended Complaint and Defendants' Response Thereto and Continuing Case Management Conference (Civil L.R. 6-1, 6-2) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Whitty Somvichian in Support of Parties' Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Filing of Second Amended Complaint and Defendants' Response Thereto and Continuing Case Management Conference (Civil L.R. 6-1, 6-2))(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 56 **CLERK'S SCHEDULING NOTICE** Pursuant to this Notice, the 4/13/2016 Initial Case Management Conference is HEREBY CONTINUED TO 4/20/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying as moot #18 Stipulation Regarding the First Amended Complaint. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 54 NOTICE by Natasha Zaretsky, Nicholas Zessis, Mo Zhang, Kevin Zhu, Amy Zimmerman, Gregory Zoeller, Steven Zwick re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 35 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 53 NOTICE by Amanda Wong, Amanda Wood, Jessicah Wood, Brendan Woodruff, Joshua Wright, Samantha Wright, Selisa Wright, Jacob Wunsh, Alexander Yaldo, Chuqiao Yang, Camryn Yaros, Cynthia Yip, Alyssa Young, Hope Young, Peter Young, Allyn Yu, Gordon Yu, Christina Yun, Sierra Zang, Cory Zapatka re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 34 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 52 NOTICE by Thomas Wicker, Nicholas Wiese, Anthony Wiggins, Philip Wilkerson, Christopher Wille, Nathaniel Williams, Conner Wilson, Hannah Wilson, Stella Wilson-Frey, John Wiltse, Saul Winer, Casey Wing, Jacob Winkler, Nicholas Winter, Maxwell Witt, Audrey Wittrup, Myles Woerner, Sam Wolfe, Max Wolff, Nicole Wonderly re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 33 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 51 NOTICE by Maia Ventura, Pedro Venzor, Sandeep Verma, Omar Villa, Nikolay Vinogradov-Nurenberg, James Volz, June Vutrano, Maya Wagoner, Robert Wainblat, Raymond Wang, Bradford Ward, Jessie Watson, Angela Wayne, Amanda Weber, Misty Weiner, Patrick Weinschreider, Jaclyn Weinstein, Vivian Wenzler, James Whalen, Chelsea Whitman re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 32 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE by Maria Torruella Suarez, Katrina Tosh, Cody Trevillian, Andrew Trevino, Kailey-Alyssa Tucker, Melody Tuttle, Symeon Tzvetkov, Kimberly Vadelnieks, Desiree Valadez, Karina Valencia, Anthony Valente, Jonathan Van Ness, Amber Vandever (Schlecht), Tamara Varga, Polly Varize, Zachary Vary, Diana Vega, Kriya Issa Velasco, Samuel Velie, Quincy Venter re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 31 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE by Deborah Tackett, Rex Tai, Vanessa Tait, Samuel Tall, Kristian Talley, Kevin Tan, Tammy Tan, Ronald Tardiff, Meighan Taylor, Brian Teed, Etienne Thach, Robert Thomas, Kayla Thompson, Roy Thompson, Wyatt Thurston, Robert Thyberg, Steven Timlin, Joanna Titus, Chezare Torres, Samuel Torres re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 30 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 48 NOTICE by Miles Sorel, Craig Sotebeer, Matt Sportini, Sean Stalhandske, Zachary Stamplis, Jeff Stark, Tomasz Stawicki, Holly Stehlin, Jeffrey Stephens, Alexadner Stoffel, Richard Stofle, Joshua Storms, Rory Strahan-Mauk, Ryan Strauss, Gregory Stuck, Emilie Stuebe, Tala Sullivan, Sebastian Swae-Shampine, Ryan Swearingen, Cristina Swift re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 29 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 47 NOTICE by Kevin Shih, Reed Showalter, Daniel Shubat, Yevgeniy Shuster, Brent Sievers, Erica Siu, David Skarbowski, Brian Skillings, Matthew Slovin, Joseph Smeeding, Andrew Smith, Brittany Smith, Harrison Smith, Jordan Smith, Morgan Smith, Richard Smith, Sophia Smith, Justin Sola, Michael Solotke, Lewis Solow-Collins re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 28 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 46 NOTICE by Ishita Saxena, Kevin Saxman, Emily Schapka, Jake Scheps, Christine Schmitt, Thomas Schmitt, Congher Schomburg, Jack Schow, Thomas Schulte, Geoff Schuyler, Daniel Schwiebert, Myles Scolnick, Tyler Searls, Stephanie Seibel, Luke Sellers, Matthew Shaffer, Samir Shah, Tyler Sherer, David Sherman, Monica Sherwood re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 27 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 45 NOTICE by Benjamin Rowan, Christine Rowland, Michael Roy, Evgenia Royter, Patrick Rubio, Denise Rueda, Kurt Ruegg, David Ruelas, Christopher Rutledge, Danielle Ryder, Ardena Saarinen, Robert Saeman, Lauren Saguilig, Wilfred Salas Jr., Nicholas Samokyszyn, Matthew Sample, Jason Sanbei, Carissa Sanchez, Remy Sarhan, Lina Sarusal Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 26 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 44 NOTICE by Kellie Riggs, Eric Riley, Annelise Ringelman, Ashley Rits, Sarah Rittenour, Joseph Rivera, Michael Rivera, Derek Robbins, Kathryn Robison, Donald Rodriguez, Steven Rodriguez, John Rogers, Ryan Romain, Benjamin Romero, Patrick Rooney, Isaac Root, Sean Roper, Dara Rosenkrantz, Shoshana Rosenthal, Sean Ross re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 25 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE by Julie Rainey, Jacob Rakosi, Jay Ram, Steve Ramirez, Norma Ramos, Joseph Rapier, Dmitriy Rapoport, Debra Ray, Melanie Redd, Jay Reddy, Christian Reed, Darlene Reilley, Hannah Remis, Saila Reyes, Karen Reynaga, Justin Rezende, Joshua Rhoades, Colby Richards, Paul Richter, Voltario Rico re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 24 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 42 NOTICE by Thomas Peres, Anthony Perrotta, Dennis Peterson, Ethan Pezzolo, Kevin Pham, Matthew Phillips, Alyssa Picard, Kyle Picha, Charles Pickard, Nathanael Pickslay, Irene Pinon, Kevin Pormir, Edgar Portillo, Jesse Posehn, Brian Pybas, Stephen Racca, Patricia Radis, Shae Rafferty, Arielle Rahmanan, Laurel Rain re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 23 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 41 NOTICE by Conor O'Brien, David O'Connell, Christian Ogren, Justin O'Hare, Tim Okkema, Lauren Olney, Grant Olscamp, Christine Ondris, Corey O'Neill, Dillon Orr, Daniel Osorio, Zachary Ouellette, Jordan Paddock, Jessica Paek, Kevin Park, Marina Paske, Sara Paull, Jared Paulo, Jasmine Pawlicki, Lindsay Payne re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 22 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE by Elizabeth Mooney, Cosme Morga, Josue Morga, Stephen Morrison, Kira Moser, Gregory Mozdyniewicz, Matthew Mueller, Zachary Mullings, Karthik Munugala, Victor Muratalla Morales, Travis Murphy, Arjang Navab, Alexander Nee, Spencer Neiman, Gary Ngo, Andrew Nguyen, Dustin Niblett, Nicole Niebrzydowski, Sarah Nikdel, Jae Seong No re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 21 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE by Alyssa Mehl, Ricardo Melgoza, Kyle Mendenhall, Ignacio Mendez-Nunez, Alvaro Mendizabal, Aaron Metviner, Todd Michael, Ericka Michal, Amy Miller, Joseph Miller, Winn Miller, Ryan Millman, Amanda Mitchell, Nikki Modiri, Keyhan Moini, Richard Mojica, Nicholas Mokover, Matthew Molzahn, Aleesa Monaco, Edgar Mondragon re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 20 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 38 NOTICE by Henry Manes, Emily Martin, Sean Martin, Paul Martino, Megan Martucci, Derek Marx, Alexander Matzat, Thomas McCann, Amanda McClintock, Charles McDonald, Asher McGuffin, Tracelyn McGuire, Kevin McKeown, Ryan McKeown, Joseph McManus, Jean-Luc McMurtry, Taryn McPherson, Jason McQuade, Tyler Meacham, William Mebane re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 19 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 37 NOTICE by Athena Lo, Sergey Lobatch, Daniel Lopez, David Love, Signe Loving, Janet Lu, Eric Lujan, Elias Luna, Xinjie Luo, Matthew Lusher, Devin Lynch, Sean Lyness, Casimir Lyszczarczyk, Benjamin Mabie, Steven Mach, Carleigh Madden, Colin Madrid, William Major, Hin Mak, Mihailo Malowany re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 18 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE by Cassandra Leasure, Daniel Lecours, Bryan Leddy, Jennifer Lee-Yuen, Joanne Lee-Yuen, Josh Lehga, Adam Leotta, Benjamin Lesea-Pringle, Martha Letchinger, Shannon Levis, Daniel Lewis, Joseph Lewis, Erica Leyva Arenas, Helen Li, Michael Li, Chelsea Liebowitz, Anthony Lim, Danielle Littman, David Liu, Joshua Liu re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 17 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 35 NOTICE by Ryan King, Royce Kirk, Carli Kitto, Jessica Klix, Janice Knight, Justin Kohlberg, Casey Kono, Alec Konstantin, Maksim Korolev, Tarun Koshy, Kyle Kovacs, Ryan Kreisberg, Alexandra Kurtz, Brian Kurtz, Rhonda La Grande, Rosemary La Grua, Antonio Lamv, Justas Lauzadis, Nathan Lawson, Evan Layman re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 16 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE by Nina Johal, Joseph Johns, Karl Johnson, Rosa Johnson, Ryan Johnson, Aaron Jones, Crystal Joseph, Evan Kahn, Michael Kaspark, Brandon Kassimir, Archavanich Kawmongkolsi, Joseph Kayaleh, Jesse Kelly, Aaron Kenny, Siri Kirin Khalsa, Aaron Khansefid, B. Kim, Dae Han Kim, Shawn Kim, Andrew King re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 15 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 33 NOTICE by Mark Hollwedel, Demarie Holmes, Nia Holston, Tyler Howell, Ellen Howes, Kai Hoyt, Nicholas Hoyt, Sally Hu, Kensai Hughes, Kayla Hutchings, Torri Igou, Timothy Irvine, Jillian Jackson, Chris Jacobson, Murtaza Jafferji, Yesenia Jameson, Gustavo Jauregui, Maria Jennings, Jasmeet Jernaill, Thomas Jobst, Jr. re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 14 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 32 NOTICE by Courtney Hanson, Sawyer Hardie, Rebecca Hassinger, Quinn Hatoff, Eric Haviland, Miles Hearn, Lauren Hebert, Taylor Heisley-Cook, Richard Heitmeyer, Devon Henry, Nelson Hernandez, Austin Herry, Noah Hersom, Jesse Hertz, Elin Hervall, Mitchell Heschke, Gordon Hiland, Cory Hill, Brandon Hodges, Hailey Hollers re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 13 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE by Rachel Greenbaum, Robert Griego III, Peter Griffis, Catherine Grizzell, Derek Grosshart, Michael Guillory, Seth Guldin, Bishal Gupta, Samir Gupta, Peter Gustafson, Carmen Gutierrez, Jerrelle Guy, Acshi Haggenmiller, Jerome Hale, Michael Hall, Nicholas Hall, Michael Hallock, Mark Hamilton, Marina Handwerk, Christine Hanna re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 12 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE by Abigail Gardner, Kenneth Garges, Daniel Gauthier, Nicole Gedert, Benjamin Geilich, Paula Gelvez-Petrone, Michael Geyer, Rajan Gill, James Gillooley, Jessica Giusti, Jessica Golden, Alex Goldklang, Matt Goldman, Joel Goldschlag, Leonardo Gonzalez, Joseph Goodknight, Joseph Gradias, Shari Gray, Andrew Grazioli, Joseph Greenbaum re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 11 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 29 NOTICE by Brandon Flannery, Cynthia Flores, Kimberly Flores, Skylar Florian, Ryan Flynn, Corinne Foley, John Forbes, Alexandria Foster, Shannon Fouts, David Frailey, Samuel Frank, Joel Frattini, Mark Fredrickson, Mark Freeman, Matthew Freifeld, Charles Fukai, Thaine Fuller, Megan Gaebler, Brian Gamez, Mary Garcia re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 10 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE by Rachel Ett, Carl Evans, James Everglade, Bryan Eyers, Holden Faber, Kelsey Fahey, Roger Fairley, Sean Fanning, Robert Farrar, Kelsey Farrell, Anton Fedorov, Julia Feldman, James Feng, Kristy Fenning, Daniel Fernandez, Tova Ferstenberg, Jose Figueroa Delgado, Zachary Finch, Matthew Fisherkeller, Michael Flagg re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 9 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE by Krista Drummond, Kenneth Duckworth, David Dulle, Julia Dunn, Samuel Dunscombe, John Durbin, Michael Easterby, Andrew Ecord, Bianca Edwards, Daniel Elkus, Zina Ellis, Aunna Elrod, Colton Emel, Justin Emery, Chase Engelhardt, Jonathan Englehart, Ian Epps, Michelle Erford, Mariah Erlick, Julie Etheridge re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 8 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE by Tyler Deangelis, Michael Deck, Anthony Del Cid, Danielle Delbert, Maxwell Denny, Daniel Diaz, Lillian DiCarlo, Jeremy Diehl, Amber Diluzio, Brian Dinh, Vincent Dirienzo, Blake Disiere, Alexander Dobranic, Edward Dobyns, Aaron Doucett, Phillip Dove, Octav Dragoi, Sean Draper, Chris Driscoll, Aliah Drow re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 7 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE by Renata Costa, Joshua Cottrell-Schloemer, Layton Cox, Marlee Craker, Dax Crocker, Rory Crook, Pierre Cuglievan, Stephen D'Addio, Mark Dalgaard, Bret Dalldorf, Joseph Danehower, Zachari Daquioag, Deborah Davis, Eli Davis, Katrina Davis, Hillary Dawsey, Joseph De Jonge, Paul De La Torre, Brenda De Leon, Juliet Deamicis re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 6 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE by Michael Choi, Ref Chowdhury, Allen Chung, Chelsea Clark, Jordan Colclasure, Lisette Cole, Andrew Collins, Stephen Colon, Andrew Colucci, Ethan Compton, Emily Connelly, Julianne Conrad, Logan Cooper, Tiffany Cooper, Heather Copps, Harrison Corbett, Jeremy Cordeiro, Nicholas Corpuz, Eudald Correig Fraga, Erica Cortez re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 5 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE by Christian Carrillo, Lauren Cason, Rachel Castiglione, Britanny Castillo, Karen Catlow, Samuel Cavazos, Alexander Cerjan, Meagan Chamberlain, Brett Chamberlin, Kevin Chaney, Brian Chang, Thomas Chavez, Jonathan Chen, Randy Cherland, Ritish Chhabra, Daniel Chiang, Nina Chidichimo, Cody Childers, Sandra Childress, James Chiocchio re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Plaintiffs No. 4 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE by Patricio Brito, Daniel Brog, Grant Bronsdon, Laura Bronson, Jake Broser, Peter Broski, Barbara Brown, Cameron Brown, Noranda Brown, Mark Brunton, Jonica Buck, John Buell, Wrenn Bunker-Koesters, Ryan Burke, Adam Buxbaum, Janel Calinog, Francesca Campos, Katherine Cannon, Veronica Cano Chavez, Lauren Carlton re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Parties No. 3 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE by Lorna Battista, John Becker, Evan Beckner, Brett Bell, Ayla Benavides, Edward Benitez, Frank Benitez, Megan Bergeron, Patrick Bergerson, Rim Berhane, Robert Berry, Rhiannon Bezore, Matei Bivolaru, James Boggie, Eleanor Bohn, Myken Bomberger, Jesse Bonelli, Mariel Booth, Michaella Borges, Max Brawer re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Parties No. 2 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE by Scott Arellano, Omeed Atefi, Talia Avisar, Martha Avtandilian, Noah Baily, Jared Baker, Matt Baker, Daniel Balsam, Jason Balsamo, Laura Barajas, Kenia Barba, Mark Barbosa, Cory Barclay, Christopher Barnard, Halley Barnett, David Baroody, Forrest Bashaw, Laura Bates, Melissa Bates, Mridul Batra re #19 Amended Complaint, Notice of Entry of Additional Parties No. 1 (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 16, 2016 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google Inc. Filed by William Dormann, Ryan Corley, Shannon Mehaffey, Andy Ambrose, Brandon Arachikavitz, Adam Alsabery, Moshe Admon, Vienna Alvarez, Callum Aldred, Sean Antonacci, Luke Anderson, Javier Aguirre, Bryce Allen, Liban Aden, Nadia Aissi, Benjamin Algeo, John Alexander, Kenneth Abeyratne, Caroline Alrman, Charlee Akina, Lucas Acosta, Aisana Aitzhanova, William Alverson. (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/16/2016) Modified text on 3/22/2016 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2016 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Ryan Corley, William Dormann, Shannon Mehaffey. (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
February 18, 2016 Filing 17 **CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING AN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Following re-assignment, this case is now set for an Initial Case Management Conference before the Hon. Lucy H. Koh on 4/13/2016 at 2:00PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. A Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days before the initial conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9. Briefing schedules, including ADR, remain unchanged by the new conference date, unless otherwise modified by the Court. See Civil L.R. 7-7(d). The Parties are encouraged to familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 17, 2016 Filing 16 STIPULATION Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint (Civil L.R. 6-1(a)) filed by Google, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings pursuant to Related Case Order. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 2/12/2016. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016) Modified on 2/12/2016 (sms, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RELATED CASE ORDER (Corley). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 02/11/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016) Modified on 2/12/2016 (sms, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/12/2016 (sms, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/12/2016 (sms, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2016 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ryan Corley re #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 8, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedures 41(a) by Teddey Xiao (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Christopher Wong for Defendant Google Inc. (Wong, Kyle) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. for Google, Inc.. Defendant Google Inc.s Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Local Rule 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitty Somvichian for Defendant Google Inc. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Graham Rhodes for Defendant Google Inc. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Corley. Google, Inc. served on 2/1/2016, answer due 2/22/2016. (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 1, 2016 Filing 6 SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES 16-cv-00473 NC and 13-md-02430 LHK. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/1/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
January 28, 2016 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Defendant Google. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2016. Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2016 10:00 AM at the US District Court, 280 S. First St., San Jose, CA 95113 in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/27/16. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
January 27, 2016 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 2/10/2016. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 27, 2016 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 27, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10168097.). Filed byRyan Corley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gallo, Ray) (Filed on 1/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan Corley et al v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Corley
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Represented By: Dominic R. Valerian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Frank
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Corpuz
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bianca Edwards
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vienna Alvarez
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casimir Lyszczarczyk
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmeet Jernaill
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinn Hatoff
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Baker
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Levis
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Smith
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carleigh Madden
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Liebowitz
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Martin
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asher McGuffin
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Cortez
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Tall
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoff Schuyler
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Carrillo
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Brog
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Howes
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Hall
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Zoeller
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Feng
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Herry
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlee Akina
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Irvine
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristina Swift
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michaella Borges
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Arachikavitz
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Lamv
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Wilson
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Michael
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Goldklang
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Reilley
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Dove
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Lujan
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Zang
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan King
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Ouellette
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Flynn
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Fouts
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kriya Issa Velasco
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Ross
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathanael Pickslay
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allyn Yu
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dormann
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Represented By: Dominic R. Valerian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eli Davis
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Van Ness
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Drummond
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Schapka
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Wiese
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sherman
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Miller
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Diluzio
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lopez
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Leotta
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anton Fedorov
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rim Berhane
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Johal
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Delbert
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristian Talley
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Childress
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alec Konstantin
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myles Scolnick
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Johns
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Mach
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillary Dawsey
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Frailey
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda McClintock
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesenia Jameson
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Osorio
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Barnard
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lecours
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Rits
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Dalgaard
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Colclasure
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Sample
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Layton Cox
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Murphy
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Liu
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Thyberg
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Jauregui
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reed Showalter
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Danehower
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wainblat
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Peterson
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Bonelli
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella Wilson-Frey
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Flannery
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Benitez
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Mehl
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Park
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Ramos
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Grazioli
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rajan Gill
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandeep Verma
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Schmitt
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Reed
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda La Grande
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Remy Sarhan
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Trevillian
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Molzahn
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Root
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siri Kirin Khalsa
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Julio Rivera
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Martucci
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Cherland
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Niebrzydowski
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ardena Saarinen
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Castiglione
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rogers
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Smith
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Mebane
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liban Aden
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sebastian Swae-Shampine
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Venzor
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Dirienzo
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Yip
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Paull
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Griffis
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Leasure
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Kayaleh
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Duckworth
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew King
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Mokover
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Wright
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royce Kirk
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Remis
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Freifeld
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake Scheps
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Chiocchio
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Richter
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gillooley
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Buell
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elias Luna
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Smeeding
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Hassinger
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evgenia Royter
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Tan
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meagan Chamberlain
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Rittenour
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polly Varize
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Berry
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonardo Gonzalez
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Fahey
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Hebert
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvaro Mendizabal
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Bates
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Baily
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Bergerson
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Flores
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Leyva Arenas
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason McQuade
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forrest Bashaw
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Zimmerman
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Chamberlin
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Farrar
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Davis
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria Foster
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Hernandez
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Olscamp
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaclyn Weinstein
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Evans
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Cavazos
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Broski
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Robison
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Shih
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrelle Guy
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Phillips
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhiannon Bezore
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas McCann
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Mendenhall
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliet Deamicis
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Saeman
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Fukai
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Hodges
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archavanich Kawmongkolsi
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octav Dragoi
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Ryder
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Kurtz
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etienne Thach
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Tait
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elin Hervall
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Henry
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Ondris
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Reddy
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samir Shah
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zina Ellis
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Greenbaum
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maya Wagoner
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Layman
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colton Emel
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Hill
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Benitez
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Pybas
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yevgeniy Shuster
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skylar Florian
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Chaney
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Brawer
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Payne
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wiltse
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Skarbowski
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer Neiman
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Li
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary La Grua
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Whitman
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Burke
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conor O'Brien
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Garcia
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Leddy
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samir Gupta
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saul Winer
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Hoyt
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxwell Denny
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talia Avisar
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ignacio Mendez-Nunez
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Winkler
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Redd
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Emery
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Anderson
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David O'Connell
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Signe Loving
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Mabie
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Golden
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Wittrup
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moshe Admon
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aunna Elrod
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Vutrano
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meighan Taylor
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Ett
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omeed Atefi
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Zapatka
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Ramirez
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Elkus
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Grosshart
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hall
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Mehaffey
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Represented By: Dominic R. Valerian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Haviland
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noranda Brown
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Finch
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricio Brito
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Solow-Collins
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Heschke
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Millman
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachari Daquioag
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aisana Aitzhanova
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexadner Stoffel
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Major
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Lesea-Pringle
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Siu
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Diaz
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. Kim
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurel Rain
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murtaza Jafferji
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Chen
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Ram
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian DiCarlo
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Bronsdon
Represented By: Warren Stramiello
Represented By: Ray Edwin Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]