Stefanini v. Bay Microsystems Inc

Plaintiff: Vicki Stefanini
Defendant: Bay Microsystems Inc
Case Number: 5:2016cv00531
Filed: February 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/29/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 28, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to File a Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/28/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
May 23, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/23/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stefanini v. Bay Microsystems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Stefanini
Represented By: Frank Edward Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Microsystems Inc
Represented By: Brad Michael Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?