Minor v. FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Gary Minor
Defendant: FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, Gallagher Basset Services Ins. and Lance Freitas
Case Number: 5:2016cv00532
Filed: February 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 86 Motion for Attorney Fees. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
August 5, 2016 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requesting Billing Invoices. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/5/16. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
May 10, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/10/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
April 25, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 31 Gallagher's Motion to Dismiss; granting 33 FedEx Office's and Freitas's Motion to Dismiss; granting 38 Express's Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
March 18, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying as moot 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File; denying as moot 13 Federal Express Corporation's Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 15 FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.'s and Lance Freitas's Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
February 24, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Motion to Relate Case. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 02/24/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minor v. FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Clement Cheng
Represented By: Brooke Sikora Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: Emily Christin Pera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallagher Basset Services Ins.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Freitas
Represented By: Gregory Clement Cheng
Represented By: Brooke Sikora Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?