Supasiri Sirayanone v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Supasiri Sirayanone
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., CitiGroup, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, Toyota Financial Services Americas Corporation and Capital One, National Association
Case Number: 5:2016cv00553
Filed: February 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT. All claims against Toyota Financial Services Americas Corporation are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b).The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/22/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 14, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Plaintiff does not, by 6/21/2016, either (1) request the Clerk enter the default Toyota Financial Services Americas Corporation or otherwise resolve or dismiss claims against it, or (2) demonstrate good cause in writing why the claims should not be dismissed, the court will dismiss them with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/14/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
June 3, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. the Case Management Conference scheduled for June 9, 2016, is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on August 4, 2016. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before July 2 8, 2016. In addition, Plaintiff shall request the Clerk enter the default of Toyota Financial Services Americas Corporation, or shall otherwise resolve or dismiss the claims against it, on or before June 13, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/3/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
May 26, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 41 Stipulation for DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK WITH PREJUDICE filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank. JPMorgan Chase Bank terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/26/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 10, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 39 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (of Defendant Citigroup, Inc.) filed by Supasiri Sirayanone. CitiGroup, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/10/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
April 14, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 30 Notice (Other) of Settlement as to filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank. Plaintiff and Chase currently are negotiating the terms of a settlement agreement and expect that the settlement documentation and the obligations of the part ies thereunder will be finalized within the next thirty (30) days. Accordingly, the parties respectfully request that all pending dates and filing requirements pertaining to Chase be vacated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/14/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Supasiri Sirayanone v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Supasiri Sirayanone
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Anne Neben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiGroup, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Stephen Julian Newman
Represented By: Julieta Stepanyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Financial Services Americas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, National Association
Represented By: Amy Irene Borlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?