Van Buskirk v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: George Van Buskirk
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Asset Liquidation Group Incorporated, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Common Wealth Central Credit Union, Credit First, N.A., Discover Financial Services, LLC, Provident Credit Union, Asset Acceptance LLC and Discover Bank
Case Number: 5:2016cv00560
Filed: February 2, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Plaintiff does not, by 9/9/2016, either (1) request the Clerk enter the defaults of these defendants or otherwise resolve or dismiss claims against them, or (2) demonstrate good cause in writing why the claims should not be dismissed, the court will dismiss them with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The Case Management Conference scheduled for 9/8/2016 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/2/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
August 1, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Further Case Management Conference scheduled for 8/4/2016 is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on 9/8/2016. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before 9/1/2016. Plaintiff shall request the Clerk enter the defaults of Asset Liquidation Group Incorporated, CommonWealth Central Credit Union, Credit First, National Association, and Provident Credit Union, or shall otherwise resolve or dismiss the claims against them, on or before 8/26/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/1/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
June 6, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK WITH PREJUDICE, granting 59 . Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 6/6/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
April 29, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 45 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (of Defendant Discover Bank)filed by George Van Buskirk. Discover Bank terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/29/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 15, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 42 Notice of Settlement Between Plaintiff and Chase Bank USA (Other) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank. All pending dates and filingrequirements pertaining to Chase be vacated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/15/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Buskirk v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Van Buskirk
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra Alford McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Liquidation Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Stephen Julian Newman
Represented By: Julieta Stepanyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Common Wealth Central Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit First, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Alan Stanley Petlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Acceptance LLC
Represented By: Jessica Elaine Lanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?