Gonzalez v. Tagged, Inc.

Plaintiff: Emmanuel C. Gonzalez
Defendant: Tagged, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv00574
Filed: February 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 55 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(D) and/or Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 8(A). (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 7, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO FEERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 62(d) AND/OR FEDERAL RULE OF APPELLATE PROCEDURE 8(a) AND VACATING HEARING re 55 MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CI VIL PROCEDURE 62(d) AND/OR FEDERAL RULE OF APPELLATE PROCEDURE 8(a) filed by Emmanuel C. Gonzalez, ***Deadlines terminated. 55 MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 62(d) AND/OR FEDERAL RULE OF APPELLATE PROCEDURE 8(a) filed by Emmanuel C. Gonzalez. The Court VACATES the hearing set for November 15, 2016. Supplemental briefing by 11/11/2016.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/7/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
August 17, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 49 Tagged Inc.'s Motion for Attorney Fees. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
July 29, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating 8/9/2016 hearing on motion for attorneys' fees (Dkt. No. 49). Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/29/2016. (ygrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
June 14, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 35 Motion to Stay; granting 36 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 42 Stipulation. Judgment entered in favor of the defendant.. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
June 3, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARINGS re 35 MOTION to Stay filed by Emmanuel C. Gonzalez, 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tagged, Inc. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/3/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
April 11, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/11/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
February 23, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO REFILE ANSWER re 7 filed by Tagged, Inc., 9 filed by Tagged, Inc., 10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Tagged, Inc. Case Management Conference set for Monday, 3/21/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2016. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/23/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Tagged, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel C. Gonzalez
Represented By: Matthew K Blackburn
Represented By: Darrian Lynn Campbell
Represented By: Michael Scott Fuller
Represented By: Paul D Lein
Represented By: Paul Donsy Lein
Represented By: Jason E Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tagged, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas A Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?