Azoulai v. BMW of North America LLC

Plaintiff: Avi Azoulai
Defendant: BMW of North America LLC
Case Number: 5:2016cv00589
Filed: February 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 46 MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/13/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
October 24, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING 44 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/24/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
June 9, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 27 Case Management Conference - Initial, Set Hearings. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 06/09/2016. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
April 19, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING 17 PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/19/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azoulai v. BMW of North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avi Azoulai
Represented By: Hovanes Margarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America LLC
Represented By: Michael K. Grimaldi
Represented By: Eric Y Kizirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?