Pelayo et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Angela Pelayo and Theodore Carlo
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2016cv00648
Filed: February 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/2/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
May 12, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON AUGUST 3, 2016. Re: Dkt. No. 16 Updated Case Management Statement due by 7/27/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/12/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 9, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF CASE. Parties to submit a status update to the Court by 5/13/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/9/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
March 28, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MODIFIED ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY LITIGATION 19 . Hearing on Motion to Dismiss 16 set for 6/22/2016 01:00 PM. Opposition due by 5/25/2016. Reply due by 6/8/2016. Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2016. Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/28/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
February 22, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/22/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pelayo et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Pelayo
Represented By: September Joy Katje
Represented By: Rex John Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Carlo
Represented By: September Joy Katje
Represented By: Rex John Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jeremy E Shulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?